Winthrop Resources Corporation v. Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Franklin L Noel |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-04455 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 6:02 PM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Winthrop Resources Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winthrop Resources Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/11 7:34 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/11/2015. (PJM) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/10 2:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Winthrop Resources Corporation. Jointly Signed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc.. (McBride, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Tue 01/13 5:21 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2015 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel is cancelled. The parties report that they have settled the case and anticipate filing a Sitpulation of Dismissal within 30 to 45 days. (TMA) |
|
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/02 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2015. Motions (non-disp) due 9/1/2015. Motions (disp) due by 11/1/2015. Ready for trial due by 1/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/01/2014. (las) |
|
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: (Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2015 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/25/14. (AKL) | |
Monday, November 24, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/24/2014. (las) | |
19 | 19 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 11/24/2014 re4 MOTION for Replevin was taken under advisement. The Court will defer ruling on the motion until after the parties participate in a January 2015 settlement conference. Order to be issued. No R&R to be issued.(las) | |
18 | 18 Declaration of Matthew R. McBride in Support of4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Winthrop Resources Corporation.(Rosow, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-J | ||
17 | 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 11/24/2014 re4 MOTION for Replevin was taken under advisement. The Court will differ ruling on the motion untilafter the parties participate in a January 2015 settlement conference. Order to be issued. No R&R to be issued. (las) Modified on 11/24/2014 (TSS). | |
Friday, November 21, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Winthrop Resources Corporation. Jointly Signed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc..(McBride, Matthew) | |
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 DECLARATION of Brendan P. Sheehey in Opposition to4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn) | |
14 | 14 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn M. Raiter in OPPOSITION TO4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc..(Raiter, Shawn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-G | ||
13 | 13 15 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc..(Raiter, Shawn) | |
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Declaration of Abigail R. Nesbitt in Support of4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Winthrop Resources Corporation.(McBride, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-G | ||
11 | 11 Declaration of Michael A. Rosow in Support of4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Winthrop Resources Corporation.(McBride, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-2 | ||
10 | 10 12 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION for Replevin filed by Winthrop Resources Corporation.(McBride, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
9 | 9 Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim by Winthrop Resources Corporation. (McBride, Matthew) | |
Thursday, October 30, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER/NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 immediately following the motion hearing (see ECF #5 ) in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 10/30/2014.. (las) | |
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER In Re: Dispositive-Motion Practice. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/29/2014. (CLB) | |
6 | 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Winthrop Resources Corporation. by Corinthian Colleges, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION4 MOTION for Replevin : Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Rosow, Michael) | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Replevin by Winthrop Resources Corporation. (Rosow, Michael) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Rosow on behalf of Winthrop Resources Corporation. (Rosow, Michael) | |
Thursday, October 23, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-4455 (DSD/FLN). (lmb) | |
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-CV 14-16728 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0864-4173832.) Filed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc. No summons requested.. (Raiter, Shawn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |