Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 5:14-cv-02355
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2014
Terminated:Jun 07, 2016
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 12:45 PM EDT
Counter-Claimant
Jason Barney
Represented By
Joshua P. Shelton
Winston Wolfe
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Pranav Arora
Represented By
John F. Hill
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Akron
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Rajnish Arora
Represented By
John F. Hill
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Akron
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Does 1-10
Counter-Defendant
Highly Educated, LLC
Represented By
Eric K. Combs
Dinsmore & Shohl - Cincinnati
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Just Funky, LLC
Represented By
John F. Hill
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Akron
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Darius Wallace
Defendant
Jason Barney
Represented By
Joshua P. Shelton
Winston Wolfe
contact info
Plaintiff
Highly Educated LLC
Represented By
Eric K. Combs
Dinsmore & Shohl - Cincinnati
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2018 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, November 03, 2016
64 64 order Order Thu 4:31 PM
Marginal Order approving63 Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction over the settlement agreement for the purposes of its enforcement. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/3/2016. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
63 63 notice Stipulation Wed 7:07 PM
Proposed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Highly Educated LLC. (Combs, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
minutes Status Conference Tue 5:58 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. In-Person Conference held on 11/1/2016. Present were Attorney Eric K. Combs as counsel for Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants; and, by phone, Attorney Samuel J. Smith as counsel for Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff. Also present were Third-Party Defendant Raj Arora; and, by phone, Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Jason Barney. The Court and the parties discussed the settlement impasse described at ECF No.58 . The settlement terms on which there was disagreement were resolved. As set forth in the Order of Case Dismissal at ECF No.51 , the parties agreed to submit a proposed and executed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice and a copy of the Settlement Agreement by 11/2/2016. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the case. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 1 Hour 30 Minutes. (JLG)
Related: [-]