Barbara Jo Radley and Bryan Neil Radley
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | G Michael Halfenger |
Case #: | 2:14-bk-33164 |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 10, 2014 |
Discharged: | Feb 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2015 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Feb 09, 2015 |
Debtor
Barbara Jo Radley
1348 W Spencer St
Appleton, WI 54914-4972 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Bryan Neil Radley
1348 W. Spencer St
Appleton, WI 54914 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Paul G. Swanson
107 Church Avenue P.O. Box 617
Oshkosh, WI 54903 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Docket last updated: 08/01/2017 1:49 PM CDT |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-33164 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11505937. Fee amount 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 59 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filed by Barbara Jo Radley, Bryan Neil Radley Fee Amount: $335. (Fields, Jeffrey) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Jeffrey K. Fields on behalf of Barbara Jo Radley. (Fields, Jeffrey) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Jeffrey K. Fields on behalf of Bryan Neil Radley. (Fields, Jeffrey) | |
4 | 4 Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/10/2014 at 10:30 AM in Oshkosh, Winnebago County Courthouse, 415 Jackson Street, Oshkosh, WI 54901. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 02/09/2015. (Fields, Jeffrey) |