Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:23-cv-02052
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 9:59 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Living Fuel Inc
Represented By
Walter D James, III
James PLLC
contact info
Dominick Graziano
Bush Graziano Rice & Platter
contact info
Counter Defendant
Progressive Laboratories Inc
Represented By
Donald M Kaiser, Jr
Kaiser Legal Solutions PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Living Fuel Inc
Represented By
Walter D James, III
James PLLC
contact info
Dominick Graziano
Bush Graziano Rice & Platter
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Jay J Madrid
Dorsey & Whitney LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Progressive Laboratories Inc
Represented By
Donald M Kaiser, Jr
Kaiser Legal Solutions PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
appeal Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted Mon 05/05 9:13 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 25-10232 Related [+]: Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 2 Volume(s) electronic transcript. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (axm)
Related: [-] lated to85 ,88 appeal