Gloria Cannon et al v. Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-02241 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 8:27 PM PDT |
Defendant
Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colony American Homes LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Port Street Realty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Cannon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marnice Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Wed 06/24 3:47 PM
ORDER Re: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: Stipulation to Dismiss Case30 . Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that the above captioned matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, without costs against any party, and the court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement between the parties. (iva) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 06/18 9:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)1 filed by plaintiffs Gloria Cannon.(Iyalomhe, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order approving stipulation to dismiss entire action | ||
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 05/15 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: Stipulation for Settlement28 . Case settled but may be reopened if settlement is not consummated within 60 days. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iva) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Settlement
Wed 05/13 9:17 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Settlement with Proof of Service filed by Defendants Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC, Colony American Homes LLC.(Ortiz, Abel) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 05/11 4:25 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Wendell F. Hall in place of attorney Abel Ortiz 25 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 05/11 4:22 PM
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: A settlement was reached. The parties signed a settlement agreement. The parties are directed to notify the assigned District Judge regarding the settlement of this matter. (kca) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Fri 05/01 4:02 PM
First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Wendell F. Hall in place of attorney Abel Ortiz (Attorney Frances O'Meara added to party Port Street Realty Corporation(pty:dft))(O'Meara, Frances) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 04/13 2:54 PM
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Thecourt and counsel conferred. The court continues the matter for a Further Settlement Conference on Friday, May 8, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.Court Recorder: XTR RECORDER. (kca) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 03/30 2:06 PM
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Court and counsel engaged in settlement discussions off the record. The partieswere unable to reach a settlement. The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Status Conference on Monday, April 13, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (kca) |
|
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/17 3:19 PM
ORDER RE SETTLEMENBT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for settlement proceedings.The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for March 30, 2015, at9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 3 or 4 of the United States District Court, RiversideCourthouse, located at 3470 Twelfth Street in Riverside, California (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/13 8:38 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Set deadlines and hearings( Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2015. Discovery cut-off 7/20/2015. Motions due by 9/1/2015. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/13/2015. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips.) (mrgo) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 02/13 8:36 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/13/2015. The parties shall file a joint report no later than 10 days after the settlement conference regarding the progress of mediation. The parties elect to proceed with Settlement Procedure No. 1, to appear before United States Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 01/26 2:27 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Gloria Cannon..(Iyalomhe, David) |
|
Att: 1 ADR 01 Request | ||
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 12/11 10:48 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (wro) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 12/11 9:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),3 WITH PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Port Street Realty Corporation.(Ortiz, Abel) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 12/11 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Port Street Realty Corporation, (Attorney Abel Ortiz added to party Port Street Realty Corporation(pty:dft))(Ortiz, Abel) |
|
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 12/08 10:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),3 with JURY DEMAND and PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC, Colony American Homes LLC.(Ortiz, Abel) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 12/08 10:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC, Colony American Homes LLC, (Attorney Abel Ortiz added to party Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Abel Ortiz added to party Colony American Homes LLC(pty:dft))(Ortiz, Abel) |
|
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 12/04 10:35 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gloria Cannon, upon Defendant Colony American Homes LLC served on 11/17/2014, answer due 12/8/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Inc, authorized agent, received by Becky DeGeorge (agent) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Iyalomhe, David) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 12/04 10:32 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gloria Cannon, upon Defendant Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC served on 11/17/2014, answer due 12/8/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Inc, authorized agent, received by Becky DeGeorge (agent) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Iyalomhe, David) |
|
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gloria Cannon, upon Defendant Port Street Realty Corporation served on 11/17/2014, answer due 12/8/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Pintar, defendant's agent for service of process, received by Diana Salvador, authorized agent/associate in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Iyalomhe, David) | |
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (iva) | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (iva) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to a U S Magistrate Judge (CV-25)7 . This form was issued in error. Please disregard. (iva) | |
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (iva) | |
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (See document for details). (iva) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Gloria Cannon, Marnice Smith. (iva) (iva). | |
4 | 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),3 as to Defendants Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC, Colony American Homes LLC, Port Street Realty Corporation. (iva) | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT against Defendants Colfin AI-CA 4 LLC, Colony American Homes LLC, Port Street Realty Corporation.Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.(Filing fee waived) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Marnice Smith, Gloria Cannon. (iva) (iva). (iva). | |
Att: 1 (11/14/2014) Complaint Part 2 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting1 Request for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (iva) | |
Friday, October 31, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiffs Gloria Cannon, Marnice Smith.(iva) | |
Att: 1 Lodged Complaint | ||
LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to duty magistrate judge. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs Gloria Cannon, Marnice Smith. (iva) |