Dancer v. Wayne P. Marsh PC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02439 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 8:31 PM MST |
Defendant
Alco Capital Group LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jimmy Bracy
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Bracy
|
|
Defendant
Mary Lynn
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Lynn
|
|
Defendant
Wayne P. Marsh PC
|
|
Plaintiff
Desiree Dancer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/29 3:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal17 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/29 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Thu 01/29 10:05 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Rodman Highley: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Attorney General on 1/12/2015. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Thu 01/29 10:04 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Rodman Highley: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 1/13/2015. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report - Status
Thu 01/15 2:50 PM
STATUS REPORT by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) |
|
Thursday, January 08, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 01/08 3:01 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff file a status report within seven (7) days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed seven (7) days from the date of this Order if Plaintiff fails to file a status report. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter without further notice if Plaintiff fails to comply within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/8/2015. (KFZ) |
|
Wednesday, December 03, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service Executed
Wed 12/03 9:47 AM
*SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Desiree Dancer: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Wayne P. Marsh, P.C. (DBA March Law Group) on 11/21/2014; upon Alco Capital Group, LLC, on 11/20/2014; upon Jimmy Bracy on 11/21/2014; and upon Mary Lynn 11/21/2014.(Skiba, John) *Modified text on 12/4/2014 (LFIG). |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Summons Issued as to Jimmy Bracy, Unknown Bracy, Mary Lynn, Unknown Lynn. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer.(Skiba, John) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
11 | 11 Summons Issued as to Alco Capital Group LLC, Wayne P. Marsh PC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer.(Skiba, John) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Desiree Dancer. (Skiba, John) | |
Tuesday, November 04, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE re: of Filing Civil Coversheet by Desiree Dancer re:2 Complaint . (Skiba, John) | |
4 | 4 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/4/2014. (KFZ) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Complaint filed by Desiree Dancer. Required document is not attached. Please file the following: Automated Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice using the event Other Notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) | |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-11031033 filed by Desiree Dancer. (submitted by John Skiba)(REK) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
1 | 1 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11031033. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 14-02439 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |