Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 1:23-cv-04691
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
NCR Corporation
Represented By
Rachel Frazier Gage
Robbins Alloy Belinfante Littlefield LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Capital Security Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Michael Lobbin
One LLP
contact info
Samuel S. Woodhouse, III
The Woodhouse Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
35 35 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Tue 05/06 8:58 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of33 Notice of Appeal filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 25-11532 A. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
34 34 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 05/02 2:52 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order, and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:33 Notice of Appeal. There is no transcript. Appeal fees have been paid on receipt# AGANDC-14268898. The District Judge is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (pjm)
Related: [-]
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 05/02 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to29 Clerk's Judgment by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AGANDC-14268898. Transcript Order Form due on 5/16/2025 (Woodhouse, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 04/28 8:42 PM
RESPONSE re31 Response (Non-Motion) Reply In Support of Evidence of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by NCR Corporation. (Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
31 31 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 04/21 7:54 PM
RESPONSE re30 Notice of Filing filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/09 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Filing Request for Attorneys Fees by NCR Corporation re25 Reply Brief(Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel F. Gage in Support of Request for Attorneys Fees
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 04/02 4:56 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff (jkb)
Related: [-]
28 28 31 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Sanctions Wed 04/02 4:51 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting23 Motion for Sanctions. As a sanction for failing to conduct a reasonable inquiry before filing a paper with the Court, NCR's motion23 for sanctions is GRANTED. SML Avvocati P.C. and The Woodhouse Law Firm are ordered to pay Robbins Alloy Belinfante Littlefield LLC's reasonable attorney's fees and litigation expenses incurred in defending against CSSs claim. For all fees awarded herein, NCR is directed to present evidence of its attorney's fees and costs within seven days of the date of entry of this Order. CSS will have ten days from the date of that filing within which to respond to the fee request. NCR shall have seven days to reply. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/2/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/02 4:57 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Tue 04/08 8:04 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re29 Clerk's Judgment, Terminate Case were done in error. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 02/28 8:22 AM
Submission of16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint , to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
27 27 8 pgs respm Reply Brief Thu 02/27 11:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to the Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc..(Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Thursday, February 06, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 02/06 4:42 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part20 Motion for Leave to File. The Court GRANTS its request to file a sur-reply, not to exceed fifteen pages, and DENIES its request for oral argument. Plaintiff shall file its sur-reply within twenty-one days of this Order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/6/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Brief Tue 11/26 2:14 PM
REPLY BRIEF re23 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 from Defendant NCR Voyix Corporation filed by NCR Corporation. (Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 11/26 3:42 PM
Submission of23 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 from Defendant , to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/13 11:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 from Defendant filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
23 23 motion Sanctions Wed 10/30 2:10 PM
MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 from Defendant with Brief In Support by NCR Corporation.(Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 10:53 AM
ORDER vacating21 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/15/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Wed 05/15 8:14 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re21 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Larkins referred in error. (aar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/14 2:43 PM
VACATED PER 22 ORDER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/14/2024. (dmb) Modified on 5/15/2024 (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/30 11:45 AM
Submission of20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to the Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/10 6:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to the Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Woodhouse, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/09 4:28 PM
Submission of16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/02 3:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by NCR Corporation.(Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Document Requests in Underlying Litigation,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Response to Interrogatories in Underlying Litigation
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
18 18 misc Affidavit Wed 03/20 12:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT re17 Response in Opposition to Motion Certificate of Service by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/19 11:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/05 5:02 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by NCR Corporation.(Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 133,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 145,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 192,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 193,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Federal Circuit opinion,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 243,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 248,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Florida Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 223,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 227
Monday, February 26, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 02/26 2:32 PM
Submission of14 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and15 Amended Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/20 11:58 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital Security Systems, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc..(Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/30 12:02 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Capital Systems is ordered to file an amended complaint within 21 days. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/30/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/10 4:31 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. for all further proceedings. Judge Sarah E. Geraghty no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-04691-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 1/10/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 01/10 4:34 PM
Submission of9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 12/20 10:27 AM
Submission of9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
12 12 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 12/19 10:49 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/19 5:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NCR Corporation. (Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/05 11:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/21 3:36 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by NCR Corporation.(Gage, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 133,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 145,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 192,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 193,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Federal Circuit opinion,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 243,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 248,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Florida Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 223,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Case No. 1:14-cv-1516 Dkt. 227
Friday, November 03, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/03 11:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits A-K, Civil Cover Sheet , as to NCR Corporation. (Woodhouse, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
7 7 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/30 11:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Lobbin. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/30/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Fri 10/27 4:38 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/27/2023. (sap)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 10/27 12:48 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Lobbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12987752. Attorney Stephen Michael Lobbin added appearing on behalf of Capital Security Systems, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/26 12:44 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Lobbin Pro Hac Vice.by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Woodhouse, Samuel)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 10/26 11:08 AM
RETURN of4 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Lobbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12987752) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: You have e-filed the PHV application form instead of the application. You must select "create application" and print the application to PDF before e-filing. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
4 4 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/25 4:06 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Lobbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12987752).by Capital Security Systems, Inc.. (Woodhouse, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Mon 10/16 2:51 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stephen Michael Lobbin. Clerk to follow-up by 10/26/2023. (djs)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 10/16 10:34 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to NCR Corporation. (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/16 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Capital Security Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12950530)(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet