Atelier Inc et al v. Chateau St. Croix Winery et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-04925 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 06, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 3:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Laura Chamberlin
|
|
Defendant
Troy Chamberlin
|
|
Defendant
St. Croix Winery
|
|
Defendant
Chateau St. Croix Winery
|
|
Plaintiff
Atelier Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atelier Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 08/06 9:25 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 18 Stipulation for dismissal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/06 8:30 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chateau St. Croix Winery. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 08/05 2:13 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed filed by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 8/5/2015) Modified on 8/5/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/31 4:43 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 16 Stipulation, Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled from 4/2/2015 to 8/6/2015 at 1:30 PM, joint case management conference statement due on or before 7/30/2015.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/31 9:12 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME filed by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 3/31/2015) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/31 4:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re17 Order on Stipulation, Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) |
||
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 02/09 2:47 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 14 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 02/09 9:57 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME filed by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 2/9/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/09 2:48 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2015. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/2/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015) |
||
Wednesday, December 03, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 12/03 12:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed.. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 12/3/2014) |
|
Friday, November 28, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2014) Modified on 11/28/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF). | |
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Atelier Inc, David W. Reed. Troy Chamberlin served on 11/11/2014, answer due 12/2/14. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). | |
10 | 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Atelier, Inc, David W. Reed. Laura Chamberlin served on 11/11/2014, answer due 12/2/14. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). | |
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Summons Issued as to Laura Chamberlin. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014) | |
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to Troy Chamberlin. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014) | |
7 | 7 Summons Issued as to Chateau St. Croix Winery. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014) | |
6 | 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2014) | |
4 | 4 Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2014) | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014) | |
Wednesday, November 05, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2014) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Laura Chamberlin, Troy Chamberlin, Chateau St. Croix Winery (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9050096). filed by David W. Reed, Atelier Inc.(Lewis, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/7/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |