Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Anne C Conway
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:23-cv-02434
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Mercon Construction Company
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Goodz
Chubb & Son Staff Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Gagne
Represented By
Lisa Kuhlman
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Thursday, April 18, 2024
26 26 order Order Thu 04/18 3:31 PM
ORDER : This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/18/2024. (Conway, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/17 11:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michelle Gagne. (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 8:41 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/20/2024. (KLD)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 02/20 4:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re20 Amended Complaint by Mercon Construction Company. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of settlement Fri 02/16 1:40 PM
NOTICE of settlement Parties' Joint Notice of Settlement by Mercon Construction Company (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/12 4:12 PM
ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss. The motion may be refiled in response to the Amended Complaint if appropriate. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/12/2024. (Conway, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/09 2:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mercon Construction Company with Jury Demand. filed by Michelle Gagne. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Michelle Gagne.(Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 02/08 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Lisa Kuhlman on behalf of Michelle Gagne. Lead Counsel: Lisa Kuhlman. (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/08 9:10 AM
STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022.(SFC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
17 17 utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 02/07 4:41 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Designated Lead Counsel is directed to contact opposing counsel, select a mediator off the court's approved list of mediators on the website, contact selected mediator and file a notice with the court within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the selected mediator and scheduled mediation date. Mediation to be conducted in person or the parties shall file a motion seeking permission to conduct the mediation by Zoom. Any such motion shall include a statement that the Mediator consents to mediation by Zoom. (KLD) Modified on 2/7/2024, edit text (KLD)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 02/07 4:40 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2024. Discovery due by 4/1/2025. Dispositive motions due by 4/15/2024. Pretrial statement due by 8/22/2025. All other motions due by 5/14/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2025. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2025. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/14/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/7/2024. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
15 15 misc Case Management Report Fri 02/02 4:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/19 1:33 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mercon Construction Company. Related case(s): Yes (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/19 1:32 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Mercon Construction Company. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Fri 01/19 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M. Goodz on behalf of Mercon Construction Company (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 01/19 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey M. Goodz on behalf of Mercon Construction Company. Lead Counsel: Jeffrey M. Goodz. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 01/19 1:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Mercon Construction Company. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
9 9 service Summons returned executed Wed 01/03 2:19 PM
RETURN of service executed on 12/29/2023 by Michelle Gagne as to Mercon Construction Company. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 order Interested Persons Order Wed 12/27 3:19 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/27/2023. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
7 7 service Summons issued Thu 12/21 4:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Mercon Construction Company. (KME)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 12/21 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Lisa Kuhlman on behalf of Michelle Gagne. Lead Counsel: Lisa Kuhlman. (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Thu 12/21 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Kuhlman on behalf of Michelle Gagne (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/21 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michelle Gagne. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 12/21 3:04 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michelle Gagne. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/21 9:30 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-02434-ACC-LHP. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Mercon Construction Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21586006) filed by Michelle Gagne.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet