Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Bodenhausen
Case #: 4:24-cv-00017
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024
Case in other court:St. Louis City Circuit Court, 2322-CC09608
Last checked: Monday Jul 01, 2024 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
FedEx Ground Package System Inc.
Represented By
Gregory T. Cook
Mcanany Van Cleave Pa - St. Louis
contact info
Martha E. Ravenhill
Mcanany Van Cleave Pa - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaqueta Dorsey
Represented By
Daniel R. Brown
Smith Brown LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jorge Cordero
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Represented By
Martha E. Ravenhill
Mcanany Van Cleave Pa - St. Louis
contact info

GPO May 14 2024
Jorge Cordero are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 05/14/2024. (KCD)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey's Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Jorge Cordero is DENIED. [ECF No. 14]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey's claims against Defendant

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, July 26, 2024
29 29 order Judgment - (Case) Fri 07/26 4:13 PM
JUDGMENT... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss filed on July 17, 2024 (Doc.26 ), this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/26/2024. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
28 28 misc Full Consent to a Magistrate Wed 07/24 2:55 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey, Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc.. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Thu 07/18 9:46 AM
Docket Text Order: Plaintiff and Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. have filed a Stipulation to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) signed by all parties who have appeared (Doc.26 ). Such a stipulation does not require court approval. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the stipulation, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety, including the claims against Jorge Cordero who was previously dismissed without prejudice (Doc.16 ). Judgment to enter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/17/24. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Fri 06/14 11:39 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
26 26 order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 06/13 2:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case with consent of both parties by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey. (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Case Management Order Thu 06/13 2:15 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] This case is assigned to Track 2. Discovery Completion due by 4/18/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2025. ADR Future Reference 9/13/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/9/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/13/2024. (KEK)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Rule 16 Conference Thu 06/13 2:03 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen:Rule 16 Conference held on 6/13/2024. Conference held via Zoom. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 1:00 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 1:30 p.m.) (Appearance for Plaintiff: David Bryant)(Appearance for Defendant: Martha Ravenhill) (KEK)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 06/13 11:10 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Martha E. Ravenhill for Defendants Jorge Cordero, FedEx Ground Package System Inc.. (Ravenhill, Martha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 06/11 10:21 AM
Docket Text ORDER: This matter is SET for a Status Conference at 6/25/2024 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 15S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/11/24. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
21 21 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Fri 06/07 6:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Clerk's Reassignment Order (NON-CJRA) Fri 06/07 1:37 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER (NMG). At the direction of the Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above case is reassigned to the Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen for all further proceedings. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Parties re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Fri 06/07 1:38 PM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey, Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Thu 06/06 11:24 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey. with consent of both parties . (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
18 18 order Rule 16 Order Wed 05/15 10:28 AM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS].( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/6/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/13/2024 01:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Ronnie L. White.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 05/15/2024. (KCD)
Related: [-]
17 17 order A Docket Text Order Wed 05/15 8:45 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on the Court's own motion, the Clerk of the Court shall amend the caption of this case to read as follows: Jaqueta Dorsey, plaintiff, v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., doing business as FedEx Ground, defendant. The parties shall use the amended caption on all future filings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall amended the short caption accordingly. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on May 15, 2024. (LTR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 05/14 5:02 PM
ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order of today's date, and incorporated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey's claims against Defendant Jorge Cordero are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to obtain service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 05/14/2024. (KCD)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 05/14 5:00 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey's Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Jorge Cordero is DENIED. [ECF No.14 ]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey's claims against Defendant Jorge Cordero are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 05/14/2024. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
14 14 motion Extension Fri 05/10 1:45 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Service of: Time to Serve Defendant Cordero by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey. (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Jorge Cordero. The summons was emailed to Attorney Daniel Brown. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 1 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 04/30 10:10 AM
MEMORANDUM re11 Notice of Process Server Michele Amic by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey.(Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Petition from State Court
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 service Notice of Process Server Mon 04/29 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey Process Server: Michele Amic (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Tue 04/16 11:13 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey is directed to serve Defendant Jorge Cordero and file proof of such service by May 7, 2024. Failure to comply with Rule 4(m) and this Order will result in the dismissal without prejudice of the claims against Defendant Jorge Cordero. Related [+] Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/16/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 5/7/2024.
Thursday, February 15, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 02/15 2:49 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jaqueta Dorsey. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Mon 01/29 12:47 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/10 4:39 PM
Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by FedEx Ground Package System Inc..(Cook, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Fri 01/05 12:17 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Jaqueta Dorsey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Thu 01/04 8:56 AM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Jaqueta Dorsey.(JBH)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 01/04 9:04 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 01/03 5:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Corporation.. (Cook, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Wed 01/03 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Defendant's Submission of Pleadings from State Court Action Sent To: Plaintiff(Cook, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pleadings from State Court Action
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Wed 01/03 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Cook, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Wed 01/03 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2322-CC09608, with receipt number AMOEDC-10356384, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc..(Cook, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form