Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 4:24-cv-03001
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:May 14, 2024
Case in other court:Lancaster County District Court, CI23-4150
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 3:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Collections Acquisition Company, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua C. Dickinson
Spencer, Fane Law Firm - Nebraska
contact info
Shilee T. Mullin
Spencer, Fane Law Firm - Nebraska
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert D Sheldon, Sr.
Represented By
Matthew S. Robertson
Stecklein, Robertson Law Firm
contact info
Alan J. Stecklein
Stecklein, Robertson Law Firm
contact info
Tregg R. Lunn
Law Office Of Tregg Lunn
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Terminated: 03/19/2024
Represented By
Robert W. Futhey
Fraser, Stryker Law Firm
contact info
Kimberlyn N. Hughes
Jones, Day Law Firm - Ohio
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 02/01/2024
Represented By
Katherine C. Robinson
Trans Union LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2024
ORDER On or before February 22, 2024, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Trans Union, LLC. Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiff's claims against Trans Union, LLC may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
GPO Feb 15 2024
ORDER: On or before April 1, 2024, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiff's claims against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
GPO Feb 16 2024
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report, (Filing No. 22), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
GPO Mar 25 2024
ORDER On or before April 25, 2024, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. d/b/a Payliance, d/b/a Cybercollect. Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiffs claims against Collections Acquisition Company, Inc., d/b/a Payliance, d/b/a Cybercollect, may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Tue 05/14 12:29 PM
JUDGMENT On the remaining parties' stipulation of dismissal (filing34 ), the plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (LRM)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/14 11:09 AM
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendant Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 04/17 9:16 AM
TEXT ORDER granting32 Motion to Extend time to file a stipulation of dismissal . For good cause shown the deadline to file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. d/b/a Payliance, d/b/a Cybercollect is extended to May 28, 2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
32 32 motion Extend Tue 04/16 10:49 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend time to file a stipulation of dismissal of Defendant Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. Order,,, Set/Reset All Deadlines,,31 by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Mon 03/25 4:10 PM
ORDER On or before April 25, 2024 , the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. d/b/a Payliance, d/b/a Cybercollect. Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiffs claims against Collections Acquisition Company, Inc., d/b/a Payliance, d/b/a Cybercollect, may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/25 1:46 PM
NOTICE of settlement with with Defendant Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. d/b/a Payliance d/b/a Cybercollect by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr. (Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Tue 03/19 11:04 AM
TEXT ORDER granting28 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Plaintiff's claims against Experian Information Solutions Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs, and Experian Information Solutions Inc. is terminated as a party. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Party Tue 03/19 10:45 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Party Experian Information Solutions Inc. by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
27 27 oth_doc Certificate Fri 03/08 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service/written discovery to Plaintiff by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Collections Acquisition Company, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
26 26 oth_doc Certificate Thu 03/07 2:19 PM
Certificate of service of Plaintiff's first set of written discovery to Defendant Collections Acquisition Co., Inc. by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Robertson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
25 25 oth_doc Certificate Fri 02/16 3:48 PM
Certificate of Service/initial disclosures by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Collections Acquisition Company, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Protective Order Fri 02/16 1:31 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report, (Filing No.22 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Fri 02/16 1:09 PM
CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due November 12, 2024. Planning Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 11:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
22 22 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 02/15 4:29 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Robertson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Thu 02/15 12:05 PM
ORDER: On or before April 1, 2024, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiff's claims against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_doc Certificate Thu 02/15 11:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Robertson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/15 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr. (Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Thu 02/01 3:12 PM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss Party. The plaintiff's claims against Trans Union, LLC are dismissed with prejudice, parties to bear their own fees and costs, and Trans Union is terminated as a party. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Party Thu 02/01 1:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Trans Union LLC by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr..(Robertson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
16 16 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Mon 01/22 2:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Payliance Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Payliance Holdings LLC for Collections Acquisition Company, Inc.. by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants Collections Acquisition Company, Inc., Payliance Holdings Inc., Payliance Holdings LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions Tue 01/16 2:10 PM
CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/16/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_ans Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 01/16 11:34 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,1 by Collections Acquisition Company, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Attorney Letter Tue 01/16 10:45 AM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Katherine C. Robinson has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
11 11 oth_ans Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 01/11 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,1 by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Futhey, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/11 3:01 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice9 for attorney Kimberlyn N. Hughes. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/11 1:10 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5008900 by Attorney Kimberlyn Hughes on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Hughes, Kimberlyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
8 8 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Mon 01/08 4:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendants Experian Information Solutions Inc., Experian PLC.(Futhey, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/08 11:35 AM
ORDER On or before February 22, 2024 , the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the claims against Trans Union, LLC. Absent compliance with this order, this plaintiff's claims against Trans Union, LLC may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/08 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Trans Union LLC only by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr. (Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/08 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr. (Stecklein, Alan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/08 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Robert D Sheldon, Sr. (Robertson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
3 3 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/05 10:42 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 01/05 10:33 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 01/04 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Robert D Sheldon, Sr. from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI23-4150 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5004906) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Futhey, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D