Elements Behavioral Health Inc et al v. Michael Marcus, et al.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Ralph Zarefsky |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-08760 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1338 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 9:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
Michael Marcus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elements Behavioral Health Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nanci E. Stockwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
256 | 256
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 09/06 11:09 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Elements Behavioral Health Inc, Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc..(Cohen, Noel) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
255 | 255
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/05 3:56 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HACE VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: denying253 Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy R. Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Elements Behavioral Health, Inc. and Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc.. (bp) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
254 | 254
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 09/04 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Elements Behavioral Health Inc, Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22360016)253 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom) |
|
253 | 253
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 09/04 10:49 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Elements Behavioral Health Inc, Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22360016) filed by Plaintiff Elements Behavioral Health Inc, Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc.. (Cohen, Noel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application |