District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. JMW Carpet and Flooring, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-05029 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 10:55 PM PDT |
Defendant
JMW Carpet and Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joe Hy Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marian Bourboulis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Christopherson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Maggiore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Sherak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/29 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/28 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 12/28/2015) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 11/20 1:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for 2/3/2016 is continued to 2/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The dismissal or statement remains due on 1/20/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/28 7:50 AM
ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/25 11:13 AM
NOTICE filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak of Notice of Settlement; and [Proposed] Order (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 9/25/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/28 7:52 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dismissal or statement due by 1/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) |
||
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 08/20 8:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 26 Motion to Continue JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Wed 08/19 2:14 PM
MOTION to Continue JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; and [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak. (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 8/19/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/20 8:51 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/24 2:22 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 9/23/2015 at 10:00 AM. Location to be determined. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 07/24 6:25 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE filed by Marian Bourboulis, John Sherak, Chris Christopherson, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, John Maggiore, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 07/23 9:54 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak. (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 7/23/2015) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 07/07 4:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 22 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/07 4:55 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Continue
Mon 07/06 4:07 PM
MOTION to Continue; - Joint Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference; and [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak. (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 7/6/2015) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Thu 05/28 11:40 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Robert Pohls as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 05/06 9:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 19 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/06 9:40 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Continue
Tue 05/05 11:42 AM
MOTION to Continue Joint Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference; and [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak.(Stafford, Michele) (Filed on 5/5/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) | ||
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 04/30 9:11 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund filed by Marian Bourboulis, John Sherak, Chris Christopherson, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, John Maggiore, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 30, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
Wed 04/29 3:08 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak. (Stafford, Michele) (Filed on 4/29/2015) |
|
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 02/05 10:33 AM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 15 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/05 10:34 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Continue
Tue 02/03 4:00 PM
MOTION to Continue Joint Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference; and [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak.(Stafford, Michele) (Filed on 2/3/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) | ||
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/30 2:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byJMW Carpet and Flooring, Inc., Joe Hy Wang. (Simpson, Paul) (Filed on 1/30/2015) |
|
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 01/28 10:26 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nanda, Shivani) (Filed on 1/28/2015) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/09 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Christopherson, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Maggiore, John Sherak, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. All Defendants. (Nanda, Shivani) (Filed on 1/9/2015) |
|
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014) | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
Monday, November 24, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/24/14. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014) | |
9 | 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014) | |
Thursday, November 20, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak.. (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 11/20/2014) | |
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak Revised Civil Cover Sheet . (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 11/17/2014) | |
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to JMW Carpet and Flooring, Inc., Joe Hy Wang. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) | |
5 | 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) | |
Att: 1 Standing Order | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) | |
CLERK'S NOTICE counsel to resubmit corrected civil cover sheet. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) | ||
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Proposed Summons. (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 11/13/2014) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Sherak re1 Complaint,, (Russell, Erica) (Filed on 11/13/2014) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9071598.). Filed by Chris Christopherson, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, John Maggiore, John Sherak, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, Marian Bourboulis, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades.(Russell, Erica) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |