Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 2:24-cv-00002
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Spriggs Construction LLC
Represented By
Mary Dee Allen
Wimberly, Lawson, Seale, Wright & Daves, PLLC
contact info
Jerome D. Pinn
Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, Pllc (knoxville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Morgan Patterson
Represented By
Anne Hunter
Hunter Law Firm
contact info
Anne Bennett Hunter
Hunter Law Firm
contact info
Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons
Hunter Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
32 32 motion Continue Mon 05/12 6:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Spriggs Construction LLC. (Pinn, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 04/14 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne Bennett Hunter (Hunter, Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/13 1:19 PM
ORDER granting29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/13/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/12 3:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion to Continue Wed 03/05 3:50 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties appeared for a telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge on March 5, 2025, regarding their joint motions for an extension of time to complete discovery25 and to continue the trial date26 . Counsel shall meet and confer to attempt to schedule all remaining discovery. By March 12, 2025, the parties shall file a joint motion proposing an amended case management calendar. The parties' pending motions (Doc. Nos.25 ,26 ) are TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling as addressed by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/5/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Wed 03/05 10:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/5/2025. (Hearing lasted 00:08)(sd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/27 2:57 PM
ORDER: This matter is set for a case management conference on March 5, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. The discovery deadline is provisionally CONTINUED only to accommodate the case management conference and will be reset by separate order after the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/27/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
26 26 motion Continue Mon 02/10 2:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 02/10 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 02/07 12:22 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/12 2:46 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 11/08 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 08/02 10:38 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Morgan Patterson. (Lyons, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 07/30 9:46 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/30/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 07/30 9:44 AM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/30/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
18 18 motion Protective Order Fri 07/26 3:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Spriggs Construction LLC.(Pinn, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -Agreed Protective Order
Monday, April 08, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 04/08 12:17 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 9/23/2025 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 9/5/2025. Witness List due by 9/5/2025. Pretrial Conference is set for 9/12/2025 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/8/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
16 16 order Case Management Order Thu 04/04 10:51 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2024. Discovery due by 12/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/4/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Thu 04/04 9:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 4/4/2024. (Hearing lasted 00:06)(sd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Case Management Order Mon 04/01 7:06 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Morgan Patterson. (Hunter, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/22 4:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Spriggs Construction LLC.(Allen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/15 11:41 AM
ORDER: On March 14, 2024, counsel filed a joint motion to continue the initial case management conference set on March 19, 2024.12 . The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to April 4, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/15/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/15 11:43 AM
Reset Hearing per Order13 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Thu 03/14 3:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Spriggs Construction LLC. (Allen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/07 12:49 PM
ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Spriggs Construction LLC answer due 3/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/7/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/06 5:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Spriggs Construction LLC. (Pinn, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/01 9:17 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Dee Allen admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/29 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Dee Allen on behalf of All Defendants (Allen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/26 1:16 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Morgan Patterson. Spriggs Construction LLC served on 1/25/2024. (Hunter, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 11:55 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/9/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 01/09 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/19/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 4:43 PM
Summons issued as to Spriggs Construction LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 01/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 01/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 01/08 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Spriggs Construction LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3986091), filed by Morgan Patterson.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 01/08 4:46 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Hunter, Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]