New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Referred: Marian W Payson
Case #: 6:24-cv-06044
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Brueggers Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Marshall T. Potashner
Jaffe & Asher
contact info
Plaintiff
Buckingham Properties, LLC
259 Alexander Street
Rochester, NY 14607
Represented By
Bryan J. Daniels
Ricotta Mattrey Callocchia Markel & Cassert
contact info
Plaintiff
Monroe Clover Plaza, LLC
Represented By
Bryan J. Daniels
Ricotta Mattrey Callocchia Markel & Cassert
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/14 3:56 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/14/24. (JHF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs to Any Party by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 1:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 6/3/2024. First Mediation Session due by 8/1/2024. Mandatory Disclosures due by 4/30/2024. Fact Discovery to be completed by 2/3/2025. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 2/3/2025. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 4/1/2025. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 5/15/2025. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/1/2024. (KAH)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 04/02 1:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2024. Court to issue Scheduling Order. Appearances: Bryan J. Daniels, Esq. for plaintiffs; Marshall T. Potasher, Esq. for defendants. (KAH)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Discovery Plan Mon 04/01 10:45 AM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Buckingham Properties, LLC, Monroe Clover Plaza, LLC.(Daniels, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/27 1:42 PM
ORDER ( Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference. ) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/27/2024. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
utility E-Filing Notification Wed 02/07 9:11 AM
E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of6 to "AMENDED NOTICE of Removal" and7 to "DECLARATION in Response" to clarify the filing events. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
8 8 order Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/06 1:33 PM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/6/24. (JHF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Declaration Tue 02/06 1:27 PM
DECLARATION signed by Marshall T. Potashner re3 Order to Show Cause filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' 7.1 Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - New Horizon Decision,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - CGL Declarations,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Umbrella Declarations,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Buckingham Complaint in Other Action
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/06 12:33 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re3 Order to Show Cause (Amended Notice of Removal)(Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Exhibit C to Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit D to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Exhibit E to Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Exhibit F to Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Exhibit G to Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Stipulation,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Docket Index
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 1:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 10:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buckingham Properties, LLC, Monroe Clover Plaza, LLC. (Daniels, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/23 10:00 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 01/23/2024. (CDH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 01/22 12:53 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 01/22 12:53 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 01/22 12:55 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 01/22 4:40 PM
ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Monroe, case number E20233014699. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5085002), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Exhibit C to Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit D to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Exhibit E to Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Exhibit F to Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Exhibit G to Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Stipulation,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Docket Index,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet