LLC ENERGOALLIANCE v. REPUBLIC OF MOLDOVA
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher R Cooper |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01921 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:0202 Award under Convention on Foreign Arbitral Awards |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 19-07106 USCA, 19-07142 21-07141 USCA, 23-07048 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 10:13 AM EST |
Petitioner
LLC SPC STILEKS
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
REPUBLIC OF MOLDOVA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Petitioner
LLC ENERGOALLIANCE
Terminated: 03/09/2017
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
LLC KOMSTROY
Terminated: 06/24/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 02/26 9:33 AM
USCA Case Number 24-7023 for136 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by LLC KOMSTROY, LLC ENERGOALLIANCE, LLC SPC STILEKS. (znmw) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
137 | 137
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 02/16 1:41 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re136 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (zjm) |
|
136 | 136
1
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 02/16 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to135 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment, by LLC ENERGOALLIANCE, LLC KOMSTROY, LLC SPC STILEKS. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-10694200. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Burd, Gene) |