Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:14-cv-14176
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2014
Last checked: Sunday May 17, 2015 8:36 AM EDT
Defendant
President and Fellows of Harvard College
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
M. B.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
K. C.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Sarah Cole
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Y. D.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
G. E.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
A. G.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
I. G.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
R. H.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
J. L.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Fadhal Moore
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Arjini Kumari Nawal
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
R. S.
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Keyanna Wigglesworth
Represented By
Rahsaan D. Hall
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Represented By
William S. Consovoy
Consovoy Mccarthy PLLC
contact info
Benjamin C. Caldwell
Burns & Levinson LLP
contact info
Thomas R. McCarthy
Consovoy Mccarthy PLLC
contact info
Patrick Strawbridge
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John Michael Connolly
Consovoy Mccarthy PLLC
contact info
Paul M Sanford
Burns & Levinson LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Honorable and Reverend The Board of Overseers
Terminated: 01/12/2015

GPO Jun 15 2015
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER enteredMEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PROPOSED DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE the Proposed Intervenors Motion to Intervene 30 is DENIED; however, the Proposed Intervenors are granted leave to participate in this action as amici curiae. (Montes, Mariliz)
GPO Jun 02 2017
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction [ECF No. 187] is DENIED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
GPO Jun 02 2017
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion for partial judgment on the pleadings as to Count IV and VI [ECF No. 185] is GRANTED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)

1. Five Things You Need to Know About the Harvard Admissions Lawsuit (thecrimson.com)
Submitted Tue 09/04/2018
2. Documents released in Harvard admissions lawsuit (news.harvard.edu)
Submitted Mon 06/18/2018
3. Race case against Harvard moves forward (cnn.com)
Submitted Wed 04/11/2018
4. Trump administration backs Asian-American students in Harvard admissions lawsuit (cnn.com)
Submitted Mon 04/09/2018
5. Harvard Asian-American Bias Complaint Dismissed (wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 07/08/2015
6. Harvard lawsuit is not what it seems (cnn.com)
Submitted Tue 11/25/2014
7. Lawsuit alleges biased admissions at UNC, Harvard Favor blacks over whites, Asians - (robesonian.com)
Submitted Wed 11/19/2014
8. Affirmative action lawsuits hit Harvard and UNC (cbsnews.com)
Submitted Tue 11/18/2014
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 21, 2018
551 551 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 5:32 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to File a Reply in regards to518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Culleen, Lawrence) Modified on 9/25/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
550 550 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 2:24 PM
Opposition re532 MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
547 547 motion In Limine Mon 5:21 PM
MOTION in Limine by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
Related: [-]
546 546 motion In Limine Mon 4:14 PM
MOTION in Limine by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
545 545 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 10:42 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting539 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John J. Park Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
544 544 misc Letter/request - non-motion Mon 9:59 AM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Jahjah T. Jishbite. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
543 543 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 5:10 PM
Opposition re518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
542 542 order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 1:36 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting540 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
541 541 respm Response to Motion Fri 1:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings ,532 MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
Related: [-]
540 540 motion Seal Fri 12:34 PM
Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Pre-Trial Motions by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
Related: [-]