New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:24-cv-00548
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC
Represented By
EVAN A. BLAKER
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
GEORGE E. PALLAS
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
Plaintiff
ROGER CHINCHILLA
Represented By
THOMAS E. CHASE
Rottenberg Lipman Rich, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
REFUNDO INC
Represented By
THOMAS E. CHASE
Rottenberg Lipman Rich, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Mon 11/25 4:13 PM
MEDIATION ORDER appointing SHERYL M. GOSKI. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/25/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 9 pgs respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 05/13 1:46 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC re17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, (PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
18 18 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 05/06 1:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/23 12:54 PM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, . Motion set for 5/20/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 04/22 2:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. Responses due by 5/13/2024.(PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Brief (First Amended Complaint),
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Thu 04/18 10:40 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the time in which Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended through and including April 22, 2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/17/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 04/17 4:29 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. (BLAKER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 14 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/27 4:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by REFUNDO INC, ROGER CHINCHILLA.(CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/25 9:23 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Updating Account Mon 03/25 9:25 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance13 submitted by Evan A. Blaker on 3/22/2024 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/22 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN A. BLAKER on behalf of SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC(BLAKER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 03/22 2:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2024.(PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Stipulation to Extend),
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Tue 02/27 2:44 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the time in which Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including March 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/27/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 02/26 1:18 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint through and including March 22, 2024 by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. (PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 02/26 1:12 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. (PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE E. PALLAS on behalf of SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC (PALLAS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 1:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by REFUNDO INC, ROGER CHINCHILLA. SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 02/12 1:24 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by ROGER CHINCHILLA, REFUNDO INC. (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/12 1:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROGER CHINCHILLA, REFUNDO INC. (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 02/09 3:16 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by Thomas Chase on 2/8/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Statement. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENTS SEPARATELY USING THE EVENTS "CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT" AND "DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT". Both events can be found under the Civil-Other Filings-Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
4 4 misc Statement Thu 02/08 10:53 AM
STATEMENT Corporate and Citizenship Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 7.1 by All Plaintiffs. (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/31 2:53 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SIGMA TAX PRO, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/31 8:37 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 2:53 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 2 pgs misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 01/30 5:22 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet) by All Plaintiffs. (CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/30 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number BNJDC-15050635) with JURY DEMAND, filed by REFUNDO INC, Roger Chinchilla.(CHASE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Tue 01/30 5:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
Related: [-]