Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01276
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eyelet Design Inc.
231 Hickory Lane
Bethlehem, CT 06751
Represented By
Eyelet Design Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 3:18 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 06/20 9:34 AM
Amended Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 7/22/2024, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/19 9:45 AM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/17 5:38 PM
Amended Complaint against Seidel LLC Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 12:09 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 2:16 PM
Adversary case 24-01276 Complaint against Eyelet Design Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B