California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:24-cv-00235
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff
Cynthia Ann Watson
Represented By
Julian McMillan
Mcmillan Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 19, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/19 10:59 AM
ORDER Granting6 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/19/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 04/19 9:30 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Cynthia Ann Watson. (McMillan, Julian) (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference Tue 03/05 1:00 PM
Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadling to file Voluntary Dismissal of Stipulation for Dismissal. Voluntary Dismissal or Stipulation for Dismissal due: 5/6/24. If a Voluntary or Stipulated Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 5/6/24, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 5/9/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/5/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/04 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Cynthia Ann Watson (McMillan, Julian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Ann Watson. General Motors, LLC served. (McMillan, Julian) (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 02/05 12:32 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rxc) (jms)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 12:29 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18557028.), filed by Cynthia Ann Watson. The new case number is 3:24-cv-235-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Julian McMillan)(rxc) (jms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet