Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia M Kendall
Case #: 1:24-cv-01500
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Palm Isle Marine LLC
Defendant
George Stephen Petty
Plaintiff
Huntington Distribution Finance, Inc.
Thompson Coburn LLP One US Bank Plaza, Suite 2800
St. Louis, MO 63101
Represented By
Janki Dushyant Patel
Thompson Coburn
contact info
William Robert Bay
Thompson Coburn
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/22/2024 6:20 PM CST
Thursday, February 22, 2024
1 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bay, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Huntington Distribution Finance, Inc.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21666633.(Bay, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Huntington Distribution Finance, Inc. by William Robert Bay (Bay, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Huntington Distribution Finance, Inc. and pursuant to Rule 7.1 (Bay, William)
Related: [-]