|
GPO
Dec 08 2011
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Roger Goodman, Officer Walter, Sgt. Brown, recommending the motion for summary judgment be granted and that this action be dismissed with prejudice and that judgment be entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff on all claims as set out. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/7/2011. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
|
|
GPO
Jan 03 2012
(VACATED PER ORDER, DOC. 31) ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Warden Roger Goodman, Sergeant David Brown, and Officer Richard Waugh are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Gullett's claims are dismissed because he failed to comply with this Court's orders. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/3/2012. copy mailed to plf. (sdb) Modified on 3/12/2012 (cmj).
|
|
GPO
Mar 12 2012
Order construing plaintiff's letters 29 and 30 as a motion to vacate the order and judgment. The order and judgment dismissing this action with prejudice are VACATED. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order and report and recommendation to Gullett at Kilby.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/12/2012. (order and R&R mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
|
|
GPO
Apr 16 2012
ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that plaintiff Timothy Gullett's claims against defendants Warden Roger Goodman, Sergeant David Brown, Officer Richard Waugh, Officer King, and Officer Barlows are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/16/2012. copies to parties. (sdb)
|
|
GPO
Jun 05 2012
Order construing 37 MOTION for Reconsideration of District Judge Order re 34 Judgment and 33 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, filed by Timothy Dewayne Gullett as an objection and adopting the R&R as the opinion of this Court, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2012. (copy mailed to plaintiff at Donaldson) (cmj)
|
|
GPO
Jun 05 2012
JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2012. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
|