Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:24-cv-05208
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Sunbeam Products Inc
Represented By
Todd M. Thacker
Goldberg Segalla Llp (sfo)
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Bova
Represented By
George E McLaughlin
Mclaughlin Law Firm PC
contact info
Daniel Robert Laurence
Stritmatter Kessler Koehler Moore (sea)
contact info
Adam M Carlson
Casper, Meadows, Schwartz & Cook (ca)
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Bova
Represented By
George E McLaughlin
Mclaughlin Law Firm PC
contact info
Daniel Robert Laurence
Stritmatter Kessler Koehler Moore (sea)
contact info
Adam M Carlson
Casper, Meadows, Schwartz & Cook (ca)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
28 28 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 11:42 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
27 27 order KKE Order Setting and Amending Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Mon 03/10 7:57 AM
ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 12/8/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/12/2025, Discovery Motions due by 6/11/2025, Discovery completed by 7/11/2025, Dispositive motions due by 8/11/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/9/2025, Proposed jury instructions due by 11/17/2025, Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/24/2025, Motions in Limine due by 11/24/2025, Proposed voir dire questions due by 11/24/2025, Deposition Designations due by 11/24/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/07 3:35 PM
ORDER granting Parties'25 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines. The trial date and unexpired deadlines in the previous case schedule (Dkt. No.13 ) are VACATED, and the courtroom deputy shall enter an amended case schedule in accordance with the parties' stipulated motion. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 03/07 9:09 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines , filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. Noting Date 3/7/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 03/05 3:06 PM
ORDER denying Parties'23 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Certain Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 03/05 11:20 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Certain Deadlines , filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. Noting Date 3/5/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Tue 03/04 2:58 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Statement of Local Counsel) to PHV Application of Matthew C. Wilson re 17 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
21 21 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Tue 03/04 2:56 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Statement of Local Counsel) to PHV Application of David J. O'Connell re 18 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blake Edward Marks-Dias on behalf of Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
19 19 order Protective Order Wed 01/22 3:43 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 1:05 PM
ORDER re15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David O'Connell for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 2:18 PM
ORDER re16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew C. Wilson for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 1:01 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew C. Wilson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8799325 (Thacker, Todd)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 12:51 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David J. O'Connell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8799249 (Thacker, Todd)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Wed 01/15 2:20 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice15 by attorney David J. O'connell will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney David J. O'connell) (HH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 1:52 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (filed by defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc.) by parties (Thacker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
13 13 order KKE Order Setting and Amending Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Fri 07/05 12:48 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/6/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/10/2025, Discovery Motions due by 4/9/2025, Discovery completed by 5/9/2025, Dispositive motions due by 6/9/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 8/7/2025, Motions in Limine due by 9/2/2025, Proposed jury instructions due by 9/15/2025, Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/22/2025, Proposed voir dire questions due by 9/22/2025, Deposition Designations due by 9/22/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Joint Status Report Fri 07/05 11:58 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Laurence, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
11 11 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 06/04 4:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Registered Agent for Defendant on 5/28/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Laurence, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/29 12:34 PM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney George E McLaughlin for PLAINTIFFS Elizabeth Bova and Phillip Bova, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 05/23 4:41 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/13/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/27/2024, Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 5:46 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Newell Brands Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc., Corporate Parent Sunbeam Products, Inc., Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprises, L.P. for Sunbeam Products Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Thacker, Todd)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/13 4:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. with JURY DEMAND Attorney Todd M. Thacker added to party Sunbeam Products Inc(pty:dft) by Sunbeam Products Inc.(Thacker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Tue 05/07 3:44 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice6 by attorney George McLaughlin will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
6 6 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 12:11 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George McLaughlin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8455925 (Laurence, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 2:34 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam M Carlson for PLAINTIFFS Elizabeth Bova and Phillip Bova, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 12:04 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam M. Carlson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8405025 (Laurence, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 03/15 10:52 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/15 10:35 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sunbeam Products Inc. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/15 10:28 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sunbeam Products Inc Related [+] Attorney Daniel Robert Laurence added to party Elizabeth Bova(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Robert Laurence added to party Phillip Bova(pty:pla) filed by Elizabeth Bova, Phillip Bova.(Laurence, Daniel)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8389957
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons