Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Louis Guirola, Jr
Referred: Robert P Myers, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00080
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 2nd Jud. Dist., A240224-10
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Gonzalo Carranza
Represented By
Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr.
Jernigan Copeland Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
Andrew M. Gordon - PHV
Hinshaw & Culbertson, Llp - Fort Lauderdale
contact info
Lauren Dale Swanson - PHV
Hinshaw & Culbertson, Llp - Fort Lauderdale
contact info
Defendant
Hutcheson Homecare Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua W. Stover
Burr & Forman, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-5
Defendant
LBR Management Group LLC
Represented By
Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Anthony R. Liberato
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Defendant
XYZ Pharmacy 1-5
Defendant
RFT Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Anthony R. Liberato
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Reich
Represented By
Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Anthony R. Liberato
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Defendant
Richmont Capital LLC
Represented By
Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Anthony R. Liberato
Wilkinson, Williams, Bosio & Sessoms, Pllc - Pascagoula
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Wolf, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Bryan Zelmanowitz - PHV
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
Nikki Frances Branch - PHV
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
Todd Gregory Crawford
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Safe Chain Solutions LLC
Represented By
Adam B. Harris
Phelps Dunbar, Llp - Gulfport
contact info
Shelby Schepens
Phelps Dunbar, Llp - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Tag Preservation Specialists, Corporation
Represented By
Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr.
Jernigan Copeland Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
Andrew M. Gordon - PHV
Hinshaw & Culbertson, Llp - Fort Lauderdale
contact info
Lauren Dale Swanson - PHV
Hinshaw & Culbertson, Llp - Fort Lauderdale
contact info
Defendant
Wasatch RX LLC
Represented By
William E. Whitfield, III
Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush, Pa - Gulfport
contact info
Kaara Lena Lind
Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush, Pa - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Wolf
Represented By
Andrew Bryan Zelmanowitz - PHV
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
Nikki Frances Branch - PHV
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
Todd Gregory Crawford
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard - Gulfport
contact info
Plaintiff
Primary Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Manion Anderson
Mchard, Mchard, Anderson & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Christopher C Van Cleave
Van Cleave Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Gulf Coast Pharmaceuticals Plus, LLC
Represented By
Paul Manion Anderson
Mchard, Mchard, Anderson & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Christopher C Van Cleave
Van Cleave Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
62 62 appeal Transcript Request - Appeal Tue 10/08 4:56 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hutcheson Homecare Pharmacy, Inc. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gabrielle Chambless, Telephone Number : 601-255-6432, E-mail : gabrielle_chambless@mssd.uscourts.gov. (Stover, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
appeal Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted Tue 10/01 2:43 PM
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at[LINK:http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf] using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. Pro Se Parties should request the record from the Clerks Office. (wld)
Related: [-]