California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02252
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Arevig Gevorkian
Defendant
Vahe Martirosyan
Defendant
Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Naturewell LLC
Represented By
Sevag Demirjian
Foundation Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 02/27 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC. Dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 09/18 4:04 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 09/17 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 08/19 2:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: "STIPULATION"16 .Plaintiff Naturewell LLC submitted proofs of service of Defendants Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC, Vahe Martirosyan, and Arevig Gevorkian. (Proofs of Service, ECF Nos. 12-14.) If service was effective, Defendants' answerswere due by July 15, 2024. Plaintiff unilaterally filed a "stipulation" attempting to avail Defendants of a 30-day extension of time authorized by Local Rule 8-3. (1st Stip., ECF No. 15.) No defendant is a signatory to the stipulation, so the filing was ineffective to extend Defendants' response deadline Plaintiff now seeks, again unilaterally, a further 30-day extension of Defendants' time to respond, citing settlement discussions. (2d Stip., ECF No. 16.) The Court DENIES the stipulation because it is not joined by Defendants, C.D. Cal. R. 5-4.3.4(a)(2), (e), because it fails to comply with Initial Standing Order § 4, and because it fails to present excusable neglect to reopen Defendants' response deadline, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(l)(B). The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Given Plaintiff's representation that it is engaged in settlement discussions with Defendants, the Court provides Plaintiff 30 days to file its response. In lieu of a written response, the Court will accept as responsive the filing of either Defendants' response to the complaint or Plaintiff's application for entry of Defendants default. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 08/14 1:13 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC.(Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 07/10 3:59 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arevig Gevorkian answer now due 8/15/2024; Vahe Martirosyan answer now due 8/15/2024; Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC answer now due 8/15/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC.(Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/08 3:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC, upon Defendant Vahe Martirosyan served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vahe Martirosyan, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/08 3:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC, upon Defendant Arevig Gevorkian served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Arevig Gevorkian, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/08 3:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC, upon Defendant Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vahe Martirosyan, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Mon 06/24 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause (4m) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/8/2024. (smo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/21 12:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/21 8:40 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/20 5:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/20 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 03/19 6:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 03/19 6:17 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Naturewell LLC. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/19 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC, identifying Naturewell LLC; Naturewell 2 Organic Juice Bar LLC; Vahe Martirosyan; Arevig Gevorkian. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/19 6:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC. (Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/19 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37125998 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Naturewell LLC. (Attorney Sevag Demirjian added to party Naturewell LLC(pty:pla))(Demirjian, Sevag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1