Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:24-cv-01191
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC.
Represented By
CAROLINE J. BERDZIK
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
JEREMY S. COLE
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE SCHAEFER
Represented By
RAHUL MUNSHI
Console Mattiacci Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/21 12:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC.. (COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
12 12 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 07/11 12:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/11/24. 7/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Thu 07/11 11:52 AM
Letter dated July 11, 2024 by GEORGE SCHAEFER. (MUNSHI, RAHUL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/23 8:44 AM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO 7/18/2024 11:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/23/24. 5/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Wed 05/22 11:45 AM
Letter dated May 22, 2024 by GEORGE SCHAEFER. (MUNSHI, RAHUL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/21 2:00 PM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/27/2024 02:00 PM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/21/24. 5/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/21 1:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC..(COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 05/21 1:28 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC..(COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY S. COLE on behalf of L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC. (COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE J. BERDZIK on behalf of L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC. (BERDZIK, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/22 10:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GEORGE SCHAEFER. L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC. waiver sent on 3/22/2024, answer due 5/21/2024. (MUNSHI, RAHUL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/21 7:34 AM
Summons Issued as to L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 03/20 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against L.F. DRISCOLL CO., INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17343264.), filed by GEORGE SCHAEFER.(MUNSHI, RAHUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - PHRC Complaint 7.20.22,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Right to Sue 1.3.24