Dynamic Hosting Company LLC v. Google Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01067 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 24, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 07, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday May 23, 2015 9:22 AM CDT |
Consol Defendant
Xerox Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Ricoh Americas Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Brother International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Eastman Kodak Company
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Oki Data Americas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Dynamic Hosting Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Brother International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Xerox Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Oki Data Americas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Dynamic Hosting Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dynamic Hosting Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Consol Defendant
Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Terminated: 05/11/2015
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Dell Inc
Terminated: 05/06/2015
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Epson America, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2015
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
HP Enterprise Services, LLC
Terminated: 05/22/2015
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Hewlett-Packard Company
Terminated: 05/22/2015
Consolidated from 2:14-cv-1074 3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 |
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Lantronix, Inc.
Terminated: 03/02/2015
|
|
Counter Claimant
Dell Inc
Terminated: 05/06/2015
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Epson America, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Google Inc.
Terminated: 05/11/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
179 | 179
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 10/07 1:22 PM
ORDER granting176 Stipulation of Dismissal as to AT&T Mobility, LLC and Cricket Wireless LLC (Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-1136) with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/7/2015. (ch, ) |
|
178 | 178
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 10/07 11:54 AM
ORDER granting174 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice ASUS Computer International (Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-1143). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/7/2015. (ch, ) |
|
177 | 177
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 10/07 11:21 AM
ORDER granting175 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE Kyocera Communications, Inc. (Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-1148). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/7/2015. (ch, ) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/07 8:44 AM
NOTICE the Status Conference set for October 7, 2015 is CANCELLED. (bga, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
176 | 176
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/06 4:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss AT&T by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dynamic Hosting Company LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
175 | 175
motion
Dismiss
Mon 10/05 1:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Kyocera by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC, Kyocera Communications, Inc..(Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
174 | 174
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/02 11:16 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss ASUS by ASUS Computer International, Dynamic Hosting Company LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |