Sticky's Franchise LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10856
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10856
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10872 |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Debtor
Sticky's Franchise LLC
24 E 23rd St
New York, NY 10010-4482 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 02/11 12:21 PM
Receipt Number 10095413, Fee Amount $15.00 for motion to convert (GM) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance. Filed by 237 Park LH Owner LLC. (O'Brien, Edward) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Sticky's Franchise LLC. (Weiss, John) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Sticky's Franchise LLC. (Weiss, John) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration Of Chapter 11 Cases "An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of theFederal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of theLocal Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the UnitedStates Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directingjoint administration of the chapter 11 cases of the followingentities: Stickys Holdings LLC; Sticky Fingers LLC; StickyFingers II LLC; Sticky Fingers III LLC; Sticky Fingers IV LLC;Sticky Fingers V LLC; Sticky Fingers VI LLC; Stickys BK 1LLC; Stickys NJ 1 LLC; Sticky Fingers VII LLC; Stickys NJ IILLC; Sticky Fingers IX LLC; Stickys NJ III LLC; Sticky FingersVIII LLC; Sticky NJ IV LLC; Stickys WC 1 LLC; StickysFranchise LLC; Stickys PA GK I LLC; Stickys Corporate LLC;and Stickys IP LLC. The Debtors service address in theseChapter 11 matters is Stickys Holdings LLC 24 E. 23rd Street,New York, NY 10010. The docket in the chapter 11 case ofStickys Holdings LLC, Case No. 24-10856 (JKS), should beconsulted for all matters affecting the chapter 11 cases of any ofthe foregoing entities." Signed on 4/26/2024 (AJL) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice Regarding Deficient Filings. List of Creditors due by 4/29/2024. (SJM) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Sticky Fingers II LLC, Sticky Fingers III LLC, Sticky Fingers IV LLC, Sticky Fingers IX LLC, Sticky Fingers LLC, Sticky Fingers V LLC, Sticky Fingers VI LLC, Sticky Fingers VII LLC, Sticky Fingers VIII LLC, Sticky's BK 1 LLC, Sticky's Franchise LLC, Sticky's Holdings LLC, Sticky's IP LLC, Sticky's NJ 1 LLC, Sticky's NJ II LLC, Sticky's NJ III LLC, Sticky's NJ IV LLC, Sticky's PA GK I LLC, Sticky's WC 1 LLC, Stickys Corporate LLC. (Weiss, John) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 04/25 1:13 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10872 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number B11560619, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Sticky's Franchise LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/24/2024. (Weiss, John) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 04/25 8:47 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) |