Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:24-cv-03122
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 1:05 PM CDT
Defendant
BPS Direct LLC
2500 E. Kearney St
Springfield, MO 65803
Represented By
Cristin J Mack
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Stl
contact info
Mark E. Schmidtke
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-In
contact info
Defendant
Bass Pro Group LLC
Represented By
Cristin J Mack
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Stl
contact info
Mark E. Schmidtke
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-In
contact info
Plaintiff
Nora Ruiz
Represented By
George A. Hanson
Stueve Siegel Hanson, Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Ryan L. McClelland
Mcclelland Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Caleb Joseph Wagner
Stueve Siegel Hanson, Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Alexander Thomas Ricke
Stueve Siegel Hanson, Llp - Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
41 41 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 03/07 4:43 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re40 MOTION for attorney fees , Expenses, and a Service Award filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Plaintiff Nora Ruiz. Related [+] (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-] 40
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander T. Ricke,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - SSH Firm Resume
40 40 motion Attorney Fees Fri 03/07 4:36 PM
MOTION for attorney fees , Expenses, and a Service Award filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Nora Ruiz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/21/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
39 39 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 01/16 11:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re36 MOTION for order to Direct Class Notice and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Nora Ruiz. ( Final Approval Hearing set for 5/29/2025 09:30 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), The Named Plaintiff shall file her motion for approval of the settlemetn two weeks prior tot he final approval hearing. Class Counsel shall file their motion for attorneys fees, costs and expenses, and the Service Payment on or before 3/7/2025. Motions terminated:36 MOTION for order to Direct Class Notice and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Nora Ruiz. Signed on 1/16/25 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
38 38 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 01/07 1:16 PM
ORDER granting35 motion for leave to file excess pages. Plaintiffs may file 28 pages, inclusive of facts and exclusive of exhibits, signature blocks, certificates of service, table of contents, and table of authorities, in their suggestions in support of preliminary approval of the class action settlement. Signed on 1/7/25 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
37 37 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Mon 01/06 8:09 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re36 MOTION for order to Direct Class Notice and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Plaintiff Nora Ruiz. Related [+] (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-] 36
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander T. Ricke,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
36 36 2 pgs motion Order Mon 01/06 8:02 PM
MOTION for order to Direct Class Notice and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Nora Ruiz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/21/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion File Excess Pages Mon 01/06 7:53 PM
MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Nora Ruiz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/21/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 12/20 2:53 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Nora Ruiz. (McClelland, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 12/06 10:04 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Nora Ruiz. (McClelland, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
32 32 order Order Thu 11/07 11:59 AM
ORDER suspending all scheduling order deadlines for 60 days as requested in the Notice of Settlement re20 Scheduling Order,, Set Deadlines,31 Notice of Settlement filed by Nora Ruiz. Signed on 11/7/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/06 10:54 AM
NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Nora Ruiz (McClelland, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/28 9:44 AM
ORDER granting29 agreed motion for extension of time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended class action complaint. Defendants have up to and including November 11, 2024 to respond to Plaintiff's motion to amend. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (KBR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/22 3:19 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to28 MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Class Action Complaint with Supporting Suggestions filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/5/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-] 28
Thursday, October 10, 2024
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Thu 10/10 4:48 PM
MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Class Action Complaint with Supporting Suggestions filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Nora Ruiz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Class Action Complaint
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/01 1:00 PM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 09/26 12:17 PM
ORDER granting22 Defendants' motion for leave to amend answer. Defendants shall file the amended answer within 5 days of the date of this Order. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (KBR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/24 2:06 PM
RESPONSE to motion re22 MOTION to amend/correct Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Integrated Suggestions in Support filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Plaintiff Nora Ruiz. Reply suggestions due by 10/8/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Filing Mon 09/23 11:54 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Errata to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Answer by BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, September 13, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/13 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
23 23 adr Designation of Mediator Thu 09/12 3:06 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Francis X. Neuner, Jr.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Tue 09/10 3:12 PM
MOTION to amend/correct Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Integrated Suggestions in Support filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Cases
Friday, August 23, 2024
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/23 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nora Ruiz of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Plaintiff Nora Ruiz.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 08/22 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:(Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2025.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 10/10/2024., Discovery Motions due by 4/9/2025.) Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Signed on 8/22/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/13 10:16 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Defendants BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 08/01 3:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Thu 07/25 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nora Ruiz Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; and Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Plaintiff Nora Ruiz.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Wed 07/24 12:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC Cerificate of Service of Discovery filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Defendants BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/19 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 adr Designation of Mediator Mon 07/15 4:08 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Francis (Frank) X. Neuner, Jr.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Thu 06/27 2:25 PM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Mon 06/17 9:14 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Defendants BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/17 9:04 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 05/28 10:58 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/1/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 7/17/2024. Signed on 5/28/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
11 11 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/20 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING re6 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to1 Complaint, Agreed filed by Bass Pro Group LLC, BPS Direct LLC., BPS Direct LLC answer due 6/17/2024; Bass Pro Group LLC answer due 6/17/2024. Signed on 5/20/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/20 8:17 AM
ORDER granting9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Mark E. Schmidtke for BPS Direct LLC and Bass Pro Group LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/17 4:31 PM
Motion to allow Mark Schmidtke to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9018293) filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC.(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bar Admissions
8 8 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Fri 05/17 11:25 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris no longer assigned to case. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 05/16 4:30 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly reassign this case to another judge. Signed on 5/16/24 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/16 11:29 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to1 Complaint, Agreed filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/30/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/16 11:25 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Cristin J Mack on behalf of BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC (Attorney Cristin J Mack added to party BPS Direct LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cristin J Mack added to party Bass Pro Group LLC(pty:dft))(Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 05/14 3:14 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Nora Ruiz. BPS Direct LLC served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 05/14 3:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Nora Ruiz. Bass Pro Group LLC served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 04/26 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Group LLC filed by Alexander Thomas Ricke on behalf of Nora Ruiz. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8981390. Service due by 7/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ricke, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 04/26 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 3:02 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]