Blackwell et al v. Paramount Petroleum LLC et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian S Miller |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00685 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday May 24, 2015 6:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aswhini Gupta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paramount Petroleum LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Awis Quadri
|
|
Plaintiff
Heather R Blackwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stormey Gale C McMaster
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 12/16 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:32 Judgment. CORRECTION: The original document contained clerical errors. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry32 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. The docket text was modified to correct the year in the jury verdict return date and the signature date to 2016. (thd) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Judgment
Thu 12/15 4:43 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the jury verdict returned on December 13, 2017, following two days of trial, in favor of defendants Paramount Petroleum LLC and Aswhini Gupta; it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that judgment is rendered for defendants, and that plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice27 28 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/2017. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Receipt for Exhibits
Wed 12/14 10:11 AM
RECEIPT for Exhibits by Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC. (plm) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Receipt for Exhibits
Wed 12/14 10:10 AM
RECEIPT for Exhibits by Heather R Blackwell, Stormey Gale C McMaster. (plm) |
|
29 | 29
trial
Jury Instructions
Wed 12/14 10:08 AM
Jury Instructions.(plm) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Jury Verdict
Wed 12/14 10:07 AM
JURY VERDICT as to plaintiff Heather Blackwell: verdict in favor of defendants.(plm) |
|
27 | 27
trial
Jury Verdict
Wed 12/14 10:04 AM
JURY VERDICT as to plaintiff Stormey McMaster: verdict in favor of defendants.(plm) |
|
26 | 26
minutes
Jury Trial - Completed 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 12/14 9:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller:Jury Trial completed on 12/13/2016 with a jury verdict in favor of defendants. Jury was excused and exhibits were returned to counsel. R. Hughes pltf counsel, G. Vardaman deft counsel (Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons.) (plm) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Jury Trial - Held
Tue 12/13 7:58 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller: Jury Trial began on 12/12/2016 with the selection of a 12 person jury. Opening statements were given and plaintiffs began their proof. After plaintiffs rested their case, motions were made and court adjourned until 8:30 a.m. on 12/13/2016. R. Hughes pltf counsel, G. Vardaman deft counsel (Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons.) (plm) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 12/09 2:50 PM
ORDER dismissing with prejudice all claims against defendant Awis Quadri pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/9/2016. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Thu 12/08 5:33 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER allowing Heather R. Blackwell and Stormey Gale C. McMaster to bring electronics into the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthouse in Little Rock for trial beginning December 12, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/08/2016. (plm) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Tue 12/06 4:43 PM
ORDER giving plaintiffs until Friday, 12/09/2016, at noon, to state why Quadri should not be dismissed before trial begins on Monday, 12/12/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/06/2016. (rhm) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Tue 12/06 11:58 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER allowing Gregory L. Vardaman, Ashwini Gupta and Anil Gupta to bring electronics into the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthouse in Little Rock for trial beginning December 12, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/06/2016. (plm) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/22 2:39 PM
SECOND AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 12/12/2016 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Motions in limine are due by 12/2/2016. Jury instructions and concise statement of case is due 12/2/16. All other deadlines not mentioned herein remain in effect. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/22/16. (bmt) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 08/22 2:28 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting18 motion to continue trial. An amended final scheduling order will issue rescheduling trial the week of December 12, 2016. No further continuances will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/22/16. (bmt) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Thu 08/11 2:09 PM
MOTION for Continuance by Heather R Blackwell, Stormey Gale C McMaster (jap) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/25 12:19 PM
FIRST AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 8/29/2016 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Motions in limine are due by 8/19/16. Jury instructions and concise statement of case due by 8/19/16. All other deadlines remain in effect. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/25/16. (bmt) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 03/23 4:07 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting14 motion to continue. An amended final scheduling order will issue. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/23/16. (bmt) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/29 2:22 PM
STATUS REPORT by Heather R Blackwell, Stormey Gale C McMaster. (Hughes, Richard) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Continue
Mon 02/29 2:20 PM
MOTION to Continue by All Plaintiffs (Hughes, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/21 10:03 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/27/2016 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 2/3/2016. All motions, except motions in limine are due by 2/29/2016. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/27/2016. Status Report due by 2/29/2016. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/21/15. (bmt) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 07/20 5:30 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Heather R Blackwell. Joint Report (Hughes, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/10 1:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC.(Vardaman, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 06/09 4:55 PM
ORDER denying3 defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2015. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 05/01 11:00 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of summons and complaint, filed by Heather R Blackwell, Stormey Gale C McMaster. Aswhini Gupta served on 4/13/2015. (jap) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 04/30 5:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC. (Vardaman, Gregory) |
|
7 | 7
brief
Brief in Support
Thu 04/30 2:50 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re3 Motion to Dismiss,6 Response to Motion to Quash Service and to Dismiss the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hughes, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/30 2:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hughes, Richard) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 04/27 10:27 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/6/2015. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2015. Proposed Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/27/2016 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/27/15. (bmt) |
|
4 | 4
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/27 9:38 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re3 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC. (Vardaman, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/27 9:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC (Vardaman, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/27 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Vardaman on behalf of Aswhini Gupta (Vardaman, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/16 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Aswhini Gupta, Paramount Petroleum LLC, Awis Quadri. (mef) |
||
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Heather R Blackwell and Stormey Gale C McMaster. Fee of $ 400 paid. Receipt Number LIT048881. Summons not issued.(kdr) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |