Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-31910

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:24-bk-31911
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Golf Carts of Cypress LLC
16518 House Hahl Rd
Cypress, TX 77433-1901
Represented By
Jason Patrick Kathman
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 09/26 10:41 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 4 Galveston County (Andresen, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Thu 07/25 6:06 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Amended Schedule A/B (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ) Related [+] (Clontz, Megan)
Related: [-] 14 Schedule A/B
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
14 14 misc Schedule A/B Wed 07/24 5:38 PM
Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ). (Clontz, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 05/31 11:05 AM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ). (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 05/13 9:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ). (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Schedule A/B Mon 05/13 9:56 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ). (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors) Fri 05/03 5:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/02 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 05/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/01 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Hearing
7 7 misc Declaration Wed 05/01 9:29 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ) Related [+] (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
6 6 court Entry Tue 04/30 1:33 PM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1015-1 directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Trojan EV, LLC (Case No. 24-31910 ; and Golf Carts of Cypress, LLC (Case No. 24-31911 . The docket in Case No. 24-31910 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries made in, Case No. 24-31910 (EVR). (njc7)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order for Joint Administration Tue 04/30 8:52 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. Case Reassigned to the Honorable Judge Rodriguez. Related [+] Signed on 4/30/2024. (mar4)
Related: [-] 4
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/30 9:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher Ross Travis (Travis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Tue 04/30 8:53 AM
Judge Eduardo V Rodriguez added to case. Involvement of Judge Jeffrey P Norman Terminated (mar4)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 motion Joint Administration Mon 04/29 6:57 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Golf Carts of Cypress LLC (Segura, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 order Setting Hearing Mon 04/29 3:27 PM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Hearing Signed on 4/29/2024 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/18/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 04/29 2:24 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By Golf Carts of Cypress LLC ). (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 04/29 1:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Golf Carts of Cypress LLC. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/29 1:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-31911 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25248419. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Mon 04/29 3:29 PM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Related [+] Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/27/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2024. (mar4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)