Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00220
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 2:21 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info
Maria Elena Llanos-Salinas
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alan Josifat Santos Bautista (1)
Terminated: 05/01/2024
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Arturo Vasquez
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Luis Ayala-Aleman
Terminated: 05/01/2024
Represented By
Mara Charlene Martinez
Mara C. Martinez, PLLC
contact info
Material Witness
Wendy Dalila Maldonado-Barrios
Terminated: 05/01/2024
Represented By
Mara Charlene Martinez
Mara C. Martinez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2024 2:48 AM CDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 4/12/2024 as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by the U.S. Probation Office. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. Based on the review of defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel and counsel will be appointed to represent the Defendant in this case. Preliminary Examination set for 04/17/2024 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III. Bond set $25,000 cash with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, the Government is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Appearances: AUSA: B Hagen, AFPD: H Garza, USPO: C Senteno, DUSM: M Arellano, ERO: B Vasquez, Interpreter: J Ortiz (mcg, 1) (09:45-09:58am)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Maria Elena Llanos-Salinas appearing for USA, filed. (Llanos-Salinas, Maria)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Jose Luis Ayala-Aleman and Wendy Dalia Maldonado Barrios as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista held on 4/12/2024. Witness(es) placed under oath. MATERIAL WITNESS AFFIDAVIT filed in USA vs Alan Josifat Santos Bautista. Witness(es) advised of Material witness affidavits and rights. Counsel will be appointed to represent witness(es). Witness(es) held without bond and remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Appearances: AUSA: B Hagen, AFPD: H Garza, USPO: C Senteno, DUSM: M Arellano, ERO: B Vasquez, Interpreter: J Ortiz (mcg, 1) (09:585-10:01am)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Arturo Vasquez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista, filed. (Vasquez, Arturo)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista (1), filed. (Cameron) (jmt1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista arrested on 4/10/2024, filed. (jmt1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/12/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Jose Luis Ayala-Aleman, Wendy Dalila Maldonado-Barrios, as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista filed. (jmt1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Alan Josifat Santos Bautista ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Alan Josifat Santos Bautista ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Jose Luis Ayala-Aleman and Wendy Dalia Maldonado Barrios. Mara Martinez appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Alan Josifat Santos Bautista, filed.
Related: [-]