Universal Debit and Credit Corporation v. Merchant Pay Network, LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Liam O'Grady |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01596 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 20, 2015 10:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Regie Lynn Kuch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merchant Pay Network, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Mincey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Nee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Zank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal Debit and Credit Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
38 | 38
order
Sealed Order
Tue 04/07 4:27 PM
Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/7/15. (klau, ) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 04/07 4:24 PM
ORDER that33 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to file the requested document UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/7/15. (klau, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/07 9:22 AM
Set Deadlines as to33 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal . Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, ) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/07 9:23 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan.33 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (clar, ) |
||
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Sealed Document
Tue 04/07 10:31 AM
Sealed Document - Exhibit A re33 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal . (klau, ) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 04/06 5:51 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for April 17, 2015 re33 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 04/06 5:46 PM
Memorandum in Support re33 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank.(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
33 | 33
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 04/06 5:43 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank.(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 04/06 5:37 PM
NOTICE by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank of Filing Joint Motion For Leave to File Document Under Seal (Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 03/25 9:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan:Settlement Conference held on 3/24/2015. Appearances of counsel. Case Settled. (per TCB chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 03/11 9:49 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference reset for 3/24/2015 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (per TCB chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Wed 03/11 1:00 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that 1. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in submissions presented, the Court makes the following rulings: a. The Joint Proposed Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/9/15. (tfitz, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Discovery Plan
Wed 03/04 3:13 PM
Parties' Proposed Discovery Plan by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation.(Bacon, James) |
|
Thursday, February 19, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/19 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Betty S.W. Graumlich on behalf of Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank (Graumlich, Betty) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 02/19 11:33 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference reset for 3/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (per TCB chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/03 5:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2015 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 6/12/2015. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/2/15.(dper) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/15 4:44 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank.(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Tuesday, January 06, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 01/06 5:10 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/17/2015 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (per TCB chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Friday, January 02, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Transcript
Fri 01/02 8:46 AM
TRANSCRIPT of motions hearing held on 12 19-2014 before Judge Liam O'Grady. Court reporter Norman Linnell, telephone number 703-549-4626. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2015.(linnell, norman) |
|
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 Consent Order Regarding Preliminary Injunctive Relief (See Order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/19/14.(dper) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 12/19 2:26 PM
ORDER, for the reasons stated in open court, denying4 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that defendants are to respond to the Complaint by 1/15/2015. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/19/2014. (rban, ) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 12/19 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2014 re4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Paul Nee, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, David Zank, James Mincey. Appearances of counsel for plaintiff and defendant. Motion argued and DENIED. Defendants to file a response to complaint by 1/15/2015. Order to follow. Court Reporter N. Linnell.(rban, ) |
|
Thursday, December 18, 2014 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 12/18 1:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Opposition
Wed 12/17 7:40 PM
Opposition to8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Grant of Temporary Injunction [CORRECTED to include Exhibit 8] filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank.(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Opposition
Wed 12/17 5:41 PM
Opposition to8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Grant of Temporary Injunction filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank.(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/17 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Folk on behalf of Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank (Folk, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (other)
Tue 12/16 5:09 PM
NOTICE by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank re1 Notice of Removal,(Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/16 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service re16 Affidavit by James Thomas Bacon on behalf of Universal Debit and Credit Corporation (Bacon, James) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Tue 12/16 10:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mitchell Reisberg by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 12/16 3:36 PM
Notice of Correction re16 Affidavit, The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (klau, ) |
||
Monday, December 15, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 12/15 4:38 PM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank. (Connolly, Helenanne) Modified text on 12/16/2014 (klau, ). |
|
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/11 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Carmen Indrisano on behalf of Universal Debit and Credit Corporation (Indrisano, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Opposition
Mon 12/08 1:06 PM
Opposition to4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 03, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/03 5:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service re11 Affidavit by James Thomas Bacon on behalf of Universal Debit and Credit Corporation (Bacon, James) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit
Wed 12/03 9:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 12/03 11:23 AM
Notice of Correction re11 Affidavit, The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (klau, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/02 11:07 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) |
||
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 12/01 4:27 PM
NOTICE by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Bacon, James) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 12/01 4:25 PM
Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 12/01 4:25 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 12/01 2:43 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for December 19, 2014 re4 MOTION to Dismiss (Connolly, Helenanne) |
|
Friday, November 28, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Universal Debit and Credit Corporation. (Bacon, James) | |
Notice of Correction re4 MOTION to Dismiss, The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date. (klau, ) | ||
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 25 pgs Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank. (klau, ) | |
4 | 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank. (klau, ) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Filing the Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in the State Court by Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, James Mincey, Paul Nee, David Zank(klau, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 21, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Merchant Pay Network, LLC. (klau, ) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Fairfax County, case number 2014-14695 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683047826.), filed by James Mincey, Regie Lynn Kuch, Merchant Pay Network, LLC, David Zank, Paul Nee. (No Answer Filed)(klau, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Receipt |