Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-cv-00576
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 27, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 4:48 AM CST
Defendant
John Doe 2
Defendant
X Corp.
Represented By
Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison
Willenken LLP
contact info
Michael R. Abrams
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
Defendant
NewsGuard Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Lambert
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Catherine Lewis Robb
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Laura Lee Prather
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Zachary C. Ewing
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jordan L. Greene
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Ryan C. Wooten
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Kasdin M. Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael John Morehead
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 9
Defendant
John Doe 8
Defendant
John Doe 7
Defendant
John Doe 6
Defendant
John Doe 5
Defendant
John Doe 4
Defendant
John Doe 3
Defendant
John Doe 10
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
Institute for Strategic Dialogue
Defendant
Google, LLC
Represented By
Sonal Naresh Mehta
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr
contact info
Paige Arnette Amstutz
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico, LLP
contact info
James Bor-Zale
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Joshua H. Lerner
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Global Engagement Center
Defendant
Global Disinformation Index
Defendant
Department of State
Represented By
Joshua M. Kolsky
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Joshua M. Kolsky
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Department of Defense
Represented By
Joshua M. Kolsky
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Webseed, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Zane
Poli, Moon & Zane, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Greyber
Greyber Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brighteon Media, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Zane
Poli, Moon & Zane, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Greyber
Greyber Law, PLLC
contact info

GPO Feb 24 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 39 Motion to Transfer Case, filed by X Corp., 38 Motion to Transfer Case, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., 37 Motion to Transfer Case, filed by Google, LLC. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm)
GPO Apr 01 2025
ORDER ADOPTING 56 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that this case, in its entirety, is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
misc Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer Mon 04/07 10:46 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Northern District of California as case number 4:25-cv-03020. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
59 59 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Wed 04/02 2:21 PM
ORDER ADOPTING56 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that this case, in its entirety, is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]