Delaware District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 1:14-cv-01442
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2014
Terminated:Feb 13, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday May 27, 2015 9:16 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Roquette Freres S.A.
Represented By
Kenneth J. Nachbar
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jeffrey M. Goehring
contact info
Brendan William Sullivan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Douglas V. Rigler
contact info
Counter Claimant
Solazyme Inc.
Represented By
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Selena E. Molina
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Daralyn J. Durie
contact info
Laura E. Miller
contact info
Timothy C. Saulsbury
contact info
Chad Michael Shandler
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Joshua H. Lerner
contact info
Counter Defendant
Roquette Freres S.A.
Represented By
Kenneth J. Nachbar
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jeffrey M. Goehring
contact info
Brendan William Sullivan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Douglas V. Rigler
contact info
Defendant
Solazyme Inc.
Represented By
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Selena E. Molina
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Daralyn J. Durie
contact info
Laura E. Miller
contact info
Timothy C. Saulsbury
contact info
Chad Michael Shandler
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Joshua H. Lerner
contact info
Plaintiff
Roquette Freres S.A.
Represented By
Kenneth J. Nachbar
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jeffrey M. Goehring
contact info
Brendan William Sullivan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Douglas V. Rigler
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/21/2015. (nmfn)
GPO Jan 12 2016
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 159 MOTION to Stay re 157 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), 154 Order, Status Report Order, Case stayed. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/12/2016. (nmfn)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
218 218 3 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/13 4:12 PM
ORDER approving (9 in 1:15-cv-00125-GAM, 217 in 1:14-cv-01442-GAM) STIPULATION and Order Lifting the Stay and Dismissing the Action With Prejudice. (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 2/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01442-GAM, 1:15-cv-00125-GAM(nmfn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
217 217 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 02/12 5:26 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Lifting the Stay and Dismissing the Action With Prejudice by Corbion N.V.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
Related: [-]