Original Case: 2:21-cv-00240

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-01876
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
AUTEL INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CORP., LTD.
Represented By
Gary Hnath
Mayer Brown, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ORANGE ELECTRONIC CO. LTD.
Represented By
J. Thad Heartfield
Heartfield Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/29/2024 4:16 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/22/2024. [1006926] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/11/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/11/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 06/11/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 07/29/2024. [ALK] [Entered: 05/28/2024 04:19 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 28 pgs Civil Case Docketed