Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Susan Prose
Case #: 1:24-cv-01594
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 2:55 AM MST
Plaintiff
Samuel Ortiz
Represented By
Andrew M. Esselman
Credit Law Center LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 09/23/2024
Represented By
Nicholas Michael Cassidy
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Preferred Credit, Inc.
Terminated: 11/13/2024
Represented By
William Frederick Jones
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, November 15, 2024
20 20 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 11/15 3:23 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to19 MOTION to Dismiss the case filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 11/15 7:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz. (Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Party Wed 11/13 11:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party as to Preferred Credit, Inc. by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz. (Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 11/13 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 11/13/2024. Pursuant to the document at18 , the Court Orders that Defendant Preferred Credit, Inc. shall be DISMISSED from this case, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
17 17 order Order Tue 10/22 12:21 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on October 22, 2024. In light of the parties'15 Notice of Settlement, the scheduling conference is vacated to be reset at a later date if necessary. Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Tue 10/22 12:03 PM
ORDER: Given the Notice of Settlement at D. 15, the Court Orders that either Dismissal Papers or a Status Report shall be due by 1/8/2025. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on October 22, 2024. Text Only Entry (gpglc3)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 10/22 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Preffered Credit, Inc. by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz (Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order Tue 09/24 12:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on September 24, 2024. Consent form due October 10, 2024 . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due October 17, 2024 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on October 24, 2024 , at 11:30 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 09/24/2024. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
13 13 order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 09/23 2:42 PM
Minute Order by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 9/23/2024. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice at12 , the Court Orders that this case against Equifax should be DISMISSED, with Equifax no longer a defendant in this matter. This dismissal shall be WITH prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) Modified on 9/23/2024 to edit text. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Party Mon 09/23 12:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz. (Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 order Order Fri 08/30 11:04 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 8/30/2024. Plaintiff filed this action on June 7, 2024, and defendant, Preferred Credit, Inc., answered on July 8, 2024. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, appeared on July 8, 2024, to file a Stipulation indicating that the parties agreed to extend the time for Equifax to file an answer or response to July 29, 2024. Equifax has yet to file an answer or response, and plaintiff has not sought an entry of default. Accordingly, plaintiff shall file a status report indicating how they intend to proceed with this case by September 20, 2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/08 12:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Attorney William Frederick Jones added to party Preferred Credit, Inc.(pty:dft) by Preferred Credit, Inc..(Jones, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Mon 07/08 9:37 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 7/29/2024. (Cassidy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Issuance Wed 06/26 8:51 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 06/26/2024, terminating as moot2 Motion for Issuance of Summonses. The summonses requested by Plaintiff have been issued by the clerk.5 Text Only Entry (sbplct2)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 order Memorandum Fri 06/21 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding2 MOTION for Issuance of Summonses filed by Samuel Ortiz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose, by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 6/21/2024. Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/07 3:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 6/7/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Issued Fri 06/07 12:24 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
4 4 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 06/07 12:20 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/07 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz (Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Issuance Fri 06/07 11:40 AM
MOTION for Issuance of Summonses by Plaintiff Samuel Ortiz.(Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Summons Exhibit B
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9721959)Attorney Andrew M. Esselman added to party Samuel Ortiz(pty:pla), filed by Samuel Ortiz.(Esselman, Andrew)
Related: [-]