Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 1:24-cv-00209
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:32 AM EST
Defendant
BARRY HUTCHINS
Represented By
JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Drummond Woodsum & Macmahon
contact info
Defendant
TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT
Represented By
JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Drummond Woodsum & Macmahon
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIE OLSZEWKSI
Represented By
WADE MCCALL
contact info
ANDREWS B. CAMPBELL
Campbell Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR
Represented By
WADE MCCALL
contact info
ANDREWS B. CAMPBELL
Campbell Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 04/29 4:59 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs motion Leave to File Mon 04/07 1:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File notice of supplemental authority by ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR Responses due by 4/28/2025. (CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 02/19 1:23 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER recused. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (clp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/19 1:24 PM
Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (clp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 8 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/06 1:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BARRY HUTCHINS, TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT. (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
13 13 19 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/23 4:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss date 10 23-2024 filed by JULIE OLSZEWKSI, ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR. Reply due by 11/6/2024.(CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit Notice of Tort claim and prejudgment interest claim
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1 Wed 10/16 3:54 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Exceed Page Limits. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss limited to 26 pages. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 1 pgs respm Response to Motion Tue 10/15 4:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 First MOTION EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by BARRY HUTCHINS, TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT. Reply due by 10/29/2024. (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief 1 Tue 10/15 2:38 PM
First MOTION EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS by ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR Responses due by 11/5/2024. (CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 20 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 10/02 2:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by BARRY HUTCHINS, TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT Responses due by 10/23/2024. (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 08/13 8:03 AM
Set Answer Deadline for BARRY HUTCHINS, TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT per ECF 7 & 8: Answer due by 10/2/2024. (clp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/12 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT waiver sent on 8/5/2024. (CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/12 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BARRY HUTCHINS waiver sent on 8/5/2024. (CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/05 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEANA M. MCCORMICK on behalf of All Defendants (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/02 2:02 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS filed by ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR, JULIE OLSZEWKSI. (Service of Process Deadline 10/31/2024)(CAMPBELL, ANDREWS) Modified on 8/2/2024 to clean up docket text (clp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 notice Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/30 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wade McCall filed by ANDREWS B. CAMPBELL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2986131.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Re: Pro Hac Vice Approval Tue 07/30 3:24 PM
NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re3 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney WADE MACCALL for JULIE OLSZEWKSI and ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney MacCall must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 8/6/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/07 4:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against BARRY HUTCHINS, TOWN OF DOVER-FOXCROFT with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR, JULIE OLSZEWKSI. (Service of Process Deadline 9/5/2024) Fee due by 6/10/2024.(mlm)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Fri 06/07 5:07 PM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2964713.), filed by ROBERT OLSZEWSKI, JR.(CAMPBELL, ANDREWS)
Related: [-]