New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Referred: Henry J Ricardo
Case #: 1:24-mc-00290
CauseM 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Fri 04/25 1:11 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David Livshiz dated 04/25/2025 re: Dismissal of Action. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
24 24 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 02/14 12:45 PM
ORDER for1 Motion for Discovery, filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd.,23 Report and Recommendations. I have reviewed Magistrate Judge Ricardo's detailed and well-reasoned Report andRecommendation for clear error and, after careful review, find none. I therefore ADOPT theReport and Recommendation in its entirety.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion at Doc. 1. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/14/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 order Report and Recommendations Thu 01/02 4:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. For the foregoing reasons, the Petition satisfies the requirements of 28 U.S.C.§ 1782 and the discretionary factors described in Intel v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., 542 U.S. 241 (2004), weigh in favor of granting the Petition. Accordingly, the Petition should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2025 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 1/2/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/27 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Intervenor Alpine Partners (BVI) L.P.'s Withdrawal of Opposition re:12 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo, for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Application at Doc. 1, Magistrate Judge Gary Stein no longer referred to the case. Motions referred to Henry J Ricardo. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Fri 11/22 7:22 PM
DECLARATION of John Wasty in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 respoth Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Fri 11/22 6:48 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili . Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/22 5:34 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 11/22 5:39 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Application at Doc. 1. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Gary Stein. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/21/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
17 17 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/07 11:46 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PETITIONERS TIME TO REPLY: it is hereby stipulated and agreed by Petitioner and Alpine, subject to the approval of the Court, that Petitioner's reply in support of the Application shall be due on November 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David Livshiz dated October 4, 2024. filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/7/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/20 5:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 11/22/2024. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/04 6:16 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David Livshiz dated October 4, 2024. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Petitioner's Time to Reply
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 4:03 PM
DECLARATION of Erik Chiarella in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 4:00 PM
DECLARATION of Duane L. Loft in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alpines February 17, 2023 Form 13G, #2 Exhibit SEC Briefing Paper).(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 3:57 PM
DECLARATION of Delroy Duncan, K.C. in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Section 106 of Bermuda Companies Act of 1981, #2 Exhibit Jardine Bermuda Court of Appeal Decision, #3 Exhibit Jardine Bermuda Supreme Court Decision, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Skeleton Argument, #5 Exhibit Sumitomos Skeleton Argument, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Reply Skeleton Argument, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs Draft Directions, #8 Exhibit Sumitomos Draft Directions, #9 Exhibit Transcript of July 18, 2023 Directions Hearing, #10 Exhibit Transcript of July 19, 2023 Directions Hearing, #11 Exhibit Directions Order, #12 Exhibit Directions Judgment, #13 Exhibit Deficiency Correspondence, #14 Exhibit Injunction Affidavit, #15 Exhibit Injunction Summons).(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
12 12 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili . Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brianna Hills Simopoulos on behalf of Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Hills Simopoulos, Brianna)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Christopher Davies on behalf of Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Davies, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Duane Louis Loft on behalf of Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 07/12 10:45 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING ALPINE PARTNERS (BVI)L.P. TO INTERVENE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated and agreed by Petitioner and Alpine, subject to the approval of the Court, that: Alpine shall be joined as a party respondent in this action. Alpine's opposition to the Application shall be due on or before August 30, 2024. Petitioner's reply in support of the Application shall be due on or before October 16, 2024. SO ORDERED. Related [+] (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/11/2024) (jca)
Related: [-] plies due by 10/16/2024., Responses due by 8/30/2024
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 07/10 11:29 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Alpine Partners (BVI), L.P...(Loft, Duane)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 06/24 11:57 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 06/24 11:58 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 06/24 2:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Yury Livshiz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. and Clear Street LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/21 9:28 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. for Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd.. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Fri 06/21 9:26 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/21 9:23 PM
DECLARATION of John Wasty in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/21 9:17 PM
DECLARATION of Brandt Henslee in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili. Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 06/21 9:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Fili . Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd...(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Discovery Fri 06/21 9:02 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application of Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd. for an Order, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782, Granting it Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29518941)Document filed by Sumitomo Pharma UK Holdings, Ltd..(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]