Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-15258

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-ap-01483
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wells Fargo, N.A.
101 N. Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104
Represented By
Wells Fargo, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren K. Delarosa
814 Schley Ave
Toms River, NJ 08755
Represented By
Robert Cameron Legg
Oliver & Legg
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, December 19, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 12/19 9:47 AM
Adversary Case (3:24-ap-1483) Closed. (mjb)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 3:13 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Lauren K. Delarosa 814 Schley Ave Toms River, NJ 08755-2323 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
Thursday, December 05, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/06 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
26 26 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 12/03 3:25 PM
Order Approving Proposed Settlement Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-] 23
25 25 misc Mediation Report Tue 12/03 12:01 PM
Mediation Report Related [+] filed by Peter Broege on behalf of Peter J. Broege (Mediator). (Broege, Peter)
Related: [-] 20 Mediation Order
court Hearing Held Tue 12/03 11:40 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Motion Granted Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Lauren K. Delarosa.Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Lauren K. Delarosa
Monday, November 11, 2024
24 24 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Mon 11/11 2:23 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Adversary settlement. Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2024. Filed by Robert Cameron Legg on behalf of Lauren K. Delarosa. Objections due by 11/26/2024. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
23 23 motion Approve Compromise or Settlement Under Rule 9019 Mon 11/11 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Lauren K. Delarosa.Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 11/06 2:25 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling Order and Mediation Order Submitted Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Lauren K DelaRosa for Service on Wells Fargo, N.A. Answer due on 8/2/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial)
Thursday, October 31, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 11/01 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 11/01 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
20 20 order Mediation Order Tue 10/29 11:25 AM
Mediation Order. Peter J. Broege (Mediator) added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/29/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Joint Scheduling Order Tue 10/29 11:20 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/29/2024. Discovery due by 2/28/2025. Trial date set for 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 8:37 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Louis Albert Bayles on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Bayles, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4
Friday, October 11, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/11 3:37 PM
Amended Complaint Filed by Robert Cameron Legg on behalf of Lauren K. Delarosa. Reason for amendment: Amendment to Count #3. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 10/11 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
15 15 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/08 3:18 PM
Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/8/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-] 12
court Hearing Held Tue 10/08 10:47 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to be Submitted Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A..Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Certification of Louis A. Bayles #3 Exhibit 1 #4 Exhibit 2 #5 Exhibit 3 #6 Exhibit 4 #7 Proposed Order #8 Certificate of Service) Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A.
Friday, October 04, 2024
14 14 answer Response Fri 10/04 2:51 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Louis Albert Bayles on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Bayles, Louis)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A..Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certification of Louis A. Bayles # 3 Exhibit 1 # 4 Exhibit 2 # 5 Exhibit 3 # 6 Exhibit 4 # 7 Proposed Order # 8 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A., Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 answer Opposition Mon 09/30 4:08 PM
Letter Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Robert Cameron Legg on behalf of Lauren K. Delarosa. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A..Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certification of Louis A. Bayles # 3 Exhibit 1 # 4 Exhibit 2 # 5 Exhibit 3 # 6 Exhibit 4 # 7 Proposed Order # 8 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A., Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 09/04 2:52 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 9/4/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (rms)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Lauren K DelaRosa for Service on Wells Fargo, N.A. Answer due on 8/2/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial)
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/03 2:22 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A..Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Bayles, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Att: 2 Certification of Louis A. Bayles
Att: 3 Exhibit 1
Att: 4 Exhibit 2
Att: 5 Exhibit 3
Att: 6 Exhibit 4
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 22, 2024
11 11 motion Withdraw As Attorney Thu 08/22 12:16 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Zabel, Lauren)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Withdraw As Attorney Thu 08/22 11:49 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Zabel, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 08/14 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Louis Albert Bayles on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Bayles, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 07/30 11:25 AM
Stipulation Between Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Lauren K. Delarosa, re:Stipulation Extending Tim Related [+] filed by Lauren Silver Zabel on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Zabel, Lauren)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lauren K. Delarosa
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 07/30 11:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Silver Zabel on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Zabel, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 07/12 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/10 9:25 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Robert Cameron Legg on behalf of Lauren K. Delarosa. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01483 Complaint by Lauren K. Delarosa against Wells Fargo, N.A.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) filed by Plaintiff Lauren K. Delarosa,2 Summons Issued to Lauren K DelaRosa for Service on Wells Fargo, N.A. Answer due on 8/2/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial) (gan)
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
4 4 order Refund Filing Fee Tue 07/09 2:39 PM
Order Granting Application for Refund of Filing Fee Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/9/2024. (dmi)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Refund Filing Fee Tue 07/09 2:20 PM
Application for Refund of Filing Fee Related [+] Filed by Lauren K. Delarosa. (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01483 Complaint by Lauren K. Delarosa against Wells Fargo, N.A.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) filed by Plaintiff Lauren K. Delarosa
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/03 12:59 PM
Summons Issued to Lauren K DelaRosa for Service on Wells Fargo, N.A. Answer due on 8/2/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 2:56 PM
Adversary case 24-01483 Complaint by Lauren K. Delarosa against Wells Fargo, N.A.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Legg, Robert)
Related: [-]