California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:24-cv-01400
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1364 Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2024
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Randy Hsieh
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Howell
Represented By
Rebecca Elyse Neubauer
Morgan And Morgan Los Angeles, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Terminated: 10/02/2024
7001 South Central Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90052
Represented By
Randy Hsieh
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
25 25 stip Dismiss Case Fri 02/28 9:51 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant United States of America.(Hsieh, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
24 24 order Substitute Attorney Wed 01/29 1:48 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby orders that the request of Rebecca E. Neubauer to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff CHRISTINA HOWELL is hereby GRANTED.; granting23 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
23 23 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Tue 01/28 5:12 PM
First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Rebecca E. Neubauer as counsel of record for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Christina Howell. (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Withdrawal
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Wed 01/08 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert A Parris has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 12/04 1:55 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/03/2025. (npo)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 12/04 1:54 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2024. Discovery cut-off 2/6/2025. Motions due by 4/3/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/3/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/25 2:40 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2024, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 11/21 4:04 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Defendant United States of America.. (Hsieh, Randy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 10/21 10:46 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/16 12:43 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition15 for Damages filed by defendant United States of America.(Hsieh, Randy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 09/13 11:50 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 10/16/2024; United States Postal Service answer now due 10/16/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants United States of America; United States Postal Service.(Attorney Randy Hsieh added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft), Attorney Randy Hsieh added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Hsieh, Randy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 07/29 9:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina Howell, upon Defendant United States of America served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/29 9:37 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina Howell, upon Defendant United States Postal Service served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rolandia Sharps, Legal Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 07/10 9:49 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (rma)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/08 10:20 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States Postal Service. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/08 10:18 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 07/08 10:10 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 07/08 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 07/08 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 07/05 2:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff CHRISTINA HOWELL. (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 07/05 2:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff CHRISTINA HOWELL. (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 07/05 2:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINA HOWELL. (Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/05 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37780915 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff CHRISTINA HOWELL. (Attorney Rebecca Elyse Neubauer added to party CHRISTINA HOWELL(pty:pla))(Neubauer, Rebecca)
Related: [-]