DeRonde v. United States of America
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James E Gritzner |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 08/25 3:18 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde,9 USCA Opinion/Judgment,5 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (vr) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
appeal
USCA Opinion/Judgment
Thu 07/02 2:46 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA advising certificate of appealability is denied and the appeal is dismissed as to5 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde,4 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde. Mandate to issue in 45 days. (vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 04/20 10:21 AM
ORDER of USCA to submit documents as to5 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde,4 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (vr) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 04/20 10:14 AM
USCA Case Number 15-1802 for5 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde,4 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (vr) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notification of Appeal to USCA
Tue 04/07 8:05 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re5 Notice of Appeal,4 Notice of Appeal filed on 4/6/2015. (vr) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 04/06 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to3 Judgment by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (jm) |
|
4 | 4
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 04/06 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to3 Judgment by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (ljf, ) |
|
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Thu 02/05 8:04 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Beverly Joan DeRonde. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 2/5/2015. (sc) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Initial Review Order
Wed 02/04 10:11 AM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER denying motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255. Certificate of appealability is denied. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Gritzner on 2/4/2015. (nlh) |
|
Friday, December 05, 2014 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 12/05 11:38 AM
Chief Judge James E. Gritzner added. (don, ) |
||
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
Fri 12/05 11:32 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Beverly Joan DeRonde. (don, ) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support |