Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01122
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Contract Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Terminated:Aug 02, 2024
Case in other court:Snohomish County Superior Court, 24-00002-04751-31
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 12:41 AM PST
Defendant
C3 Engineered Solutions LP
Defendant
Combi Packaging Systems LLC
Represented By
Wilhelm Dingler
Bullivant Houser Bailey (sea)
contact info
Antoine Julian Smith
Bullivant Houser Bailey (sea)
contact info
Martin J Pujolar
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Mark Dietzler
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kettle Cuisine LLC
Represented By
Peter Anthony Talevich
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
13 13 misc Remand Letter Fri 08/02 9:34 AM
LETTER to Snohomish County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (SB) (cc: letter, remand order, and docket sheet to Snohomish County Superior Court via USPS)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Order to Remand Case Fri 08/02 9:32 AM
ORDER granting Parties'11 Stipulated Motion to Remand Case. The case is remanded to the Washington Superior Court for Snohomish County. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 motion Remand Thu 08/01 10:06 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Kettle Cuisine LLC. Noting Date 8/1/2024, (Talevich, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 08/01 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Antoine Julian Smith for Defendant Combi Packaging Systems LLC. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 07/31 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Wilhelm Dingler for Defendant Combi Packaging Systems LLC. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 07/31 8:48 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/21/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2024, Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 07/31 8:47 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 07/30 3:52 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 07/30 12:10 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kettle Corp. for Kettle Cuisine, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Kettle Cuisine, LLC. (Talevich, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Martin J Pujolar on behalf of Defendant Combi Packaging Systems, LLC. (Pujolar, Martin)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/30 3:41 PM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Thu 07/25 2:39 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Combi Packaging Systems, LLC (Dingler, Wilhelm)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 07/25 2:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate 3M Company, Other Affiliate SIAT S.p.A. for Combi Packaging Systems, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Combi Packaging Systems, LLC. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 07/25 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 24 2-04751 31; Related [+] filed by Combi Packaging Systems, LLC.(Dingler, Wilhelm)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8560815
Att: 1 Complaint State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Documents,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet