Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Referred: Theresa L Fricke
Case #: 3:24-cv-05790
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Fri 03/14 4:54 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's14 Motion to Reopen Case. The Court DENIES the motion to reopen (Dkt. No. 14) and instead instructs Plaintiff to file a new case if he intends to pursue his claims. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, along with a form Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights and the Pro Se Guide to Filing Your Lawsuit in Federal Court. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff with enclosures)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 misc Mail Returned Wed 02/26 5:01 PM
Mail addressed to Scott Emerson Evatt returned as Undeliverable re12 Order on Report and Recommendation,13 Judgment by Court. (Dkt. Nos.12 and13 resent to Plaintiff at 61st Street address) (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 motion Reopen Case Fri 02/14 8:38 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case with change of address filed by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. Noting Date 3/6/2025. (MIH)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Judgment by Court Thu 02/13 10:19 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Comprehensive Life Resources against Scott Emerson Evatt. (MIH)(cc:Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Thu 02/13 10:17 AM
ORDER ADOPTING11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiffs failure tocomply with a court order and prosecute the case.(MIH)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
11 11 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 01/21 2:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. To date, plaintiff has not taken the steps necessary to correct deficiencies in his IFP application, has not paid the filing fee, or responded to the Court's 12/9/2024, order. Because plaintiff has failed to prosecute this case or comply with a Court order, the Court recommends this case should be dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this report to file written objections. The Clerk is directed to set the matter for consideration on 2/5/2025, as noted in the caption. by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(CJS)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Monday, December 09, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Mon 12/09 10:48 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's6 ,9 Motions for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is directed to cure the deficiencies in his IFP application by 1/8/2025. If plaintiff fails to correct the deficiencies in his IFP application by 1/8/2025, this case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court order. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(CJS)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Form
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Tue 11/19 8:18 AM
***Motion terminated:8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Scott Emerson Evatt. IFP not yet granted, Motion is proposed. (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 11/18 1:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. Noting Date 12/9/2024. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 11/13 2:09 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. Noted by Clerk for 12/4/2024. (MW)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Wed 11/13 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. New address: Western State Hospital. (dkt4 remailed) (MW)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time-Other Wed 11/13 10:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. (Clerk updated address from Pierce County Jail to Western State Hospital per this filing.) Noting Date 12/3/2024. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 10/11 8:21 AM
Mail addressed to Scott Emerson Evatt returned as Undeliverable re4 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 09/25 4:34 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/25/2024 to correct IFP application (ZMG cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 09/20 12:02 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Application. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/21/2024 to correct IFP application (ZMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
1 1 misc Application Fri 09/20 11:42 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Emerson Evatt. (ZMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet