Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:24-cv-61949
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:0451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.
a Florida corporation Corporate Creations Network, Inc. 801 US Highway 1
North Palm Beach, FL 33408
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Magrisso
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jennifer Saltz Bullock
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Anne Marie Estevez
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Mediator
Ellen Leesfield, Esq.
Plaintiff
Christopher Rhodes
Represented By
Karen Coolman Amlong
Amlong & Amlong, PA
contact info
Luis Inclan
The Amlong Firm
contact info
Jennifer E. Daley
Amlong & Amlong
contact info
William Robert Amlong
Amlong & Amlong
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 05/07 8:53 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Ellen Leesfield. Mediation Hearing set for 6/9/2025 11:00 AM Mediation Deadline 6/13/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (ksr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
29 29 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 05/05 6:22 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Ellen Leesfield, Esq. as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/9/2025 at 11:00 a.m..(Estevez, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 05/02 11:06 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant's 27 Motion for Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (cer)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Discovery Hearing Fri 05/02 11:03 AM
Defendant's request for discovery hearing (made on 5/1/2025). See DE26 .(cer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 5:14 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Discovery Dispute by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. (Magrisso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate Thu 04/24 1:42 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. Mediation Deadline 6/13/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Mediate Wed 04/23 3:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate [Complete Mediation and File Mediation Report] by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC..(Estevez, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 02/10 11:02 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Ellen Leesfield. Mediation Hearing set for 5/6/2025 01:00 PM. The Parties shall mediate via video conference Mediation Deadline 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 02/10 10:59 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Ellen Leesfield. Mediation Hearing set for 5/6/2025 01:00 PM. The Parties shall mediate via video conference. Mediation Deadline 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 02/07 7:55 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation Selected/Added Ellen Leesfield, Esq. as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/6/2025 at 1:00PM.(Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation
Thursday, January 09, 2025
20 20 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/09 5:15 PM
DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 1/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (cer)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/09 2:01 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 1/21/2026 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2025., Discovery due by 9/26/2025., Fact Discovery due by 9/26/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 3/7/2025., Mediation Deadline 5/14/2025., In Limine Motions due by 11/21/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2025., Motions due by 10/17/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/9/2026.), REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/14/2025.), REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 01/08 1:59 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(Magrisso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
17 17 4 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 12/18 11:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 10:42 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed [and Certificate of Interested Parties] by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. (Bullock, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 10:38 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. (Bullock, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/11 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Daniel Magrisso on behalf of PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Attorney Joseph Daniel Magrisso added to party PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(pty:dft). (Magrisso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/11 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Saltz Bullock on behalf of PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(pty:dft). (Bullock, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/11 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Estevez on behalf of PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Attorney Anne Marie Estevez added to party PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(pty:dft). (Estevez, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 1 pgs notice Notice of Striking Tue 11/26 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Striking9 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Christopher Rhodes,8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Christopher Rhodes by Christopher Rhodes (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 11/26 12:30 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Rhodes. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. served on 11/26/2024, response/answer due 12/17/2024. (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 11/26 12:28 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Rhodes. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. served on 11/5/2024, response/answer due 11/26/2024. (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 11/26 12:27 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Rhodes. Mark Dujnic served on 11/14/2024, response/answer due 12/5/2024. (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 7:29 AM
Summons Issued as to PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 11/22 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Publix Super Markets, Inc. a Florida corporation by Christopher Rhodes (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 3 pgs misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 7:36 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Rhodes (Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/22 10:22 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/22/2024. (lp00)
Related: [-]
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/22 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/22/2024. (lp00)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 10/21 8:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17919322, filed by Christopher Rhodes.(Inclan, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet