North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:David A Faber
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:24-cv-00916
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Case in other court:CABARRUS COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, 24CVS003448-120
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By
ELIZABETH LEA TROUTMAN
Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP
contact info
DANIEL F. E. SMITH
Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM DAVIS
Represented By
PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Cranfill Sumner And Hartzog, L.L.P.
contact info
TAYLOR SWEET
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Defendant
TANYA STATON
Plaintiff
CATHERINE GULLEDGE
Represented By
ZACHARY R. SNYDER
Plummer & Snyder, PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH R. PELLINGTON
Devore Acton & Stafford, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID GULLEDGE
Represented By
ZACHARY R. SNYDER
Plummer & Snyder, PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH R. PELLINGTON
Devore Acton & Stafford, PA
contact info

GPO May 07 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by SENIOR DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID A. FABER on 05/07/2025, the Board's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 11) is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' state law tort claims, and DENIED as to the rest of plaintiffs' claims. Plaintiffs' motion to amend the operative complaint to correct Staton's first name (ECF No. 32) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to counsel of record. (lg)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 23 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 05/07 4:07 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by SENIOR DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID A. FABER on 05/07/2025, the Board's motion to dismiss (ECF No.11 ) is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' state law tort claims, and DENIED as to the rest of plaintiffs' claims. Plaintiffs' motion to amend the operative complaint to correct Staton's first name (ECF No.32 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to counsel of record. (lg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
32 32 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/21 3:14 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct9 Amended Complaint,2 Complaint, by CATHERINE GULLEDGE(as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), CATHERINE GULLEDGE, DAVID GULLEDGE.(PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Party Name
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/15 1:52 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (to First Amended Complaint #9) by WILLIAM DAVIS. (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Acceptance of Service by Counsel Tue 04/15 1:44 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of William Davis, in his Individual Capacity on March 4, 2025. (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/15 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TAYLOR SWEET on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM DAVIS (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/15 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM DAVIS (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/25 3:43 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Official & Individual Capacity) by WILLIAM DAVIS. (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 service Acceptance of Service by Counsel Fri 03/21 1:26 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of William Davis on March 4, 2025. (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM DAVIS (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TAYLOR SWEET on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM DAVIS (SWEET, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/20 1:50 PM
Set Deadline: WILLIAM DAVIS answer due 3/25/2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
23 23 service Acceptance of Service by Counsel Tue 03/18 3:19 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel Taylor Sweet on behalf of William Davis on 03/04/2025. (PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Case Reassigned Mon 03/10 9:13 AM
Case Reassigned to SENIOR DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID A FABER. JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS no longer assigned to the case. (See Doc. 22) (Powell, Gloria)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Submitted Mon 03/10 9:41 AM
Motions Submitted:11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint to SENIOR DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID A FABER. (Powell, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 9:04 AM
DESIGNATION OF A UNITED STATES JUDGE FOR SERVICE WITHIN THE CIRCUIT. Pursuant to the authority vested in me by Title 28, United States Code, Sections 292(b) and 294(c), I do hereby designate and assign the Honorable David A. Faber to perform the duties of district judge in the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina for the period of February 14, 2025, through June 30, 2025, and for such time as needed in advance to prepare and thereafter as required to complete unfinished business in the matters. (Powell, Gloria) Modified to include Designation Order and NEF regenerated. (Powell, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/03 2:26 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION, to Response to11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. (SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/21 5:12 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/21/2025, that the Motion [Doc. #18 ] is GRANTED and that the time for the Plaintiffs to serve Defendants Staton and Davis shall be extended, and service must be made by April 21, 2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 01/21 7:13 AM
Motion Referred: RE:18 MOTION for Extension of Time TO SERVE THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (db)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/20 5:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION filed by CATHERINE GULLEDGE(as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), DAVID GULLEDGE, CATHERINE GULLEDGE. Replies due by 2/3/2025 (PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time-Other Fri 01/17 2:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time TO SERVE THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS by CATHERINE GULLEDGE(as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), DAVID GULLEDGE, CATHERINE GULLEDGE.(PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 service Summons Reissued Wed 01/15 12:04 PM
Summons Reissued as to TANYA STATON, WILLIAM DAVIS. (lg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Reissued as to Tanya Staton
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/14 5:33 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/14/2025, that Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #15 ] is GRANTED, and the time for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is extended to and include Monday, January 20, 2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility Motions Referred Fri 01/10 7:16 AM
Motion Referred: RE:15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Declaration,13 Affidavit,11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,14 Brief , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (db)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/09 4:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Declaration,13 Affidavit,11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,14 Brief by CATHERINE GULLEDGE(as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), DAVID GULLEDGE, CATHERINE GULLEDGE.(PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion
Friday, December 20, 2024
14 14 respm Brief Fri 12/20 12:40 PM
BRIEF re11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint In Support of by Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION filed by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION.(SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
13 13 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 12:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT re11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Melody Coons filed by Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION.(SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
12 12 misc Declaration Fri 12/20 12:21 PM
DECLARATION re11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint of Jeff Mitchell by Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. (SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 12/20 12:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2025 (SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/11 12:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re9 Amended Complaint by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION.(SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 1:39 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. Answer to Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2024. Signed by Lawrence H. Cunningham, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2024. (lhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/29 10:13 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by CATHERINE GULLEDGE(as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), CATHERINE GULLEDGE, DAVID GULLEDGE.(PELLINGTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/18 4:14 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. Answer due by 12/4/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/18/2024. (jsb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/15 4:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION.(SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/04 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH LEA TROUTMAN on behalf of Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION (TROUTMAN, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Right to Consent Fri 11/01 8:14 AM
Notice of Right to Consent. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 8:12 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (State Court documents originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 24CVS003448-120, issued 9/20/2024, listed as Exhibit B to1 Petition for Removal.) (sh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Fri 11/01 8:09 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (sh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Fri 11/01 8:10 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DANIEL F. E. SMITH on behalf of Defendant CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION (SMITH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc ECF 30 Day Notice Thu 10/31 2:41 PM
ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney ZACHARY R. SNYDER. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 12/2/2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT (JURY TRIAL DEMANDED) against All Defendants, filed by CATHERINE GULLEDGE (as Guardian Ad Litem for A.C., a minor), CATHERINE GULLEDGE, DAVID GULLEDGE. (State Court documents originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 24CVS003448-120, listed as Exhibit C to1 Petition for Removal.) (sh)(sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 12:09 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Cabarrus County Superior Court, 24CVS003448-120, against Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3949995.), filed by CABARRUS COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION.(SMITH, DANIEL) Modified on 10/31/2024 to correct event used and add State court information. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Register,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Summonses,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Acceptance