Davis v. Stephens
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen Cardone |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00121 |
Nature of Suit | 535 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Nov 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 12, 2014 7:03 AM CST |
Notice Only Party
Laura Haney
Office of Attorney General Postconviction Litigation Division P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711 |
|
Petitioner
Irving Alvin Davis
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
William Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
183 | 183
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/13 3:44 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bobby Lumpkin, re179 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Petitioner Irving Alvin Davis(Cosper, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |