New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:24-cv-10402
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By
DANIEL I. GOLDBERG
Offit Kurman
contact info
Defendant
CALIBER HOME LOANS INC.
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS)
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
NEWREZ LLC
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING
Represented By
REED COHN
Houser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GLENN HARDEN
44 WINDSOR LANE
WILLINGBORO, NJ 08046

GPO Nov 27 2024
OPINION AND ORDER Granting IFP application; The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Complaint (ECF No. 1) and issue summonses. While the Civil Counts (id. pp. 14-19) may proceed, the Criminal Counts (id. pp.19-37) are DISMISSED with prejudice. The United States Marshall shall serve a copy of the Complaint,Summons, and this Order upon the defendants. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/27/2024. (dmr) Modified on 11/27/2024 (dmr, ).

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
30 30 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 05/12 11:17 AM
OPINION AND ORDER Granting Motion; The Clerk is directed to terminate the Motion at ECF Nos.17 and20 and mark this case as closed. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/12/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/08 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal, ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY served on 5/6/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Mon 04/28 2:21 PM
Letter from GLENN HARDEN dated 4/15/2025 regarding Response26 filed on 3/19/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
27 27 order Text Order Tue 04/22 5:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: A hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF No.17 and20 ) is scheduled for May 20, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. before District Judge Edward S. Kiel in Courtroom 4D. So Ordered by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/22/2025. (gn, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
26 26 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/19 3:31 PM
Amended RESPONSE to Motion filed by GLENN HARDEN re20 MOTION to Dismiss ,17 MOTION to Dismiss (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
25 25 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 03/13 12:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support filed by ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION, CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING re17 MOTION to Dismiss Reply in Further Support(COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 11:08 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendants' request for three (3) additional days, until March 13, 2025, to prepare a formal reply to Plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/10/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Fri 03/07 5:26 PM
Letter from Atty. Reed Cohn re: Letter to Court re: Defendants' Reply Extension Request until 3/13/2025.(COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
22 22 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/07 4:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by GLENN HARDEN re17 MOTION to Dismiss(dmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/04 2:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal, NEWREZ LLC served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 9:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Wed 02/26 11:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION. Responses due by 4/7/2025.(GOLDBERG, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 11:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL I. GOLDBERG on behalf of ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION (GOLDBERG, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 02/11 10:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC, ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY identifying Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. as Corporate Parent..(COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certificate of Service
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 7:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC, ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY, NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING. Responses due by 3/17/2025.(COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Reed T. Cohn in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 12 Certification Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/11 11:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/27 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 01/16 4:20 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to CALIBER HOME LOANS INC. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 10:38 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendants'13 Letter request for an extension until 2/10/2025 to file a joint pre-answer motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/14/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Mon 01/13 1:45 PM
Letter from Caliber, NewRez, Shellpoint Requesting Dates Certain for MTD. (COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 order Text Order Fri 01/10 5:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Newrez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing's request for leave to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss (ECF No.10 is GRANTED. Of note, pursuant to the Court's Rules and Preferences, the Court's pre-answer motion "procedure does not apply to cases in which the pre-answer motion[ ]... [is]... filed solely... against [a] pro se litigant." So Ordered by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/10/2025. (gn, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by REED COHN on behalf of CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING (COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Thu 01/09 5:12 PM
Letter from Caliber, NewRez, Shellpoint (Pre-Motion Letter).(COHN, REED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement 7.1 Statement,
Att: 2 Hon. Edward S. Kiel Part Rules,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, December 30, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Mon 12/30 4:02 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the duplicate Summons Returned Unexecuted attached to docket entry9 filed by the Clerk's office on 12/30/2024 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 12/30 3:55 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS). (dmr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 12/27 12:32 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by the USM for GLENN HARDEN as to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS). (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/26 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USM for Plaintiff GLENN HARDEN. SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/12 3:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION, CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Clerk Thu 12/12 3:13 PM
USM 285 Forms received for ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION, CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INc, ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY, NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING and non -party RITHM CAPITAL CORP. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Tue 12/03 5:16 PM
Letter from Glenn Harden addressed to the court re: IFP application. (gn, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 misc Letter: re USM 285 Wed 11/27 4:21 PM
Letter: re USM-285 Form. Refer to the[LINK:USM Forms Page] for the USM-285 Form and a sample USM-285 Form. (dmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/27 4:19 PM
OPINION AND ORDER Granting IFP application; The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Complaint (ECF No.1 ) and issue summonses. While the Civil Counts (id. pp. 14-19) may proceed, the Criminal Counts (id. pp.19-37) are DISMISSED with prejudice. The United States Marshall shall serve a copy of the Complaint,Summons, and this Order upon the defendants. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/27/2024. (dmr) Modified on 11/27/2024 (dmr, )
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT Related [+] against ABSOLUTE HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION, CALIBER HOME LOANS INC., ICE MORTGAGE TECHNOLOGY, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), NEWREZ LLC, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, filed by GLENN HARDEN.(dmr)
Related: [-] fer to Doc.1
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 11/13 1:22 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Tue 11/12 1:38 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
1 1 37 pgs service Complaint Received Tue 11/12 1:37 PM
Complaint Received. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application IFP,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 NEF Consent Form