Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00171
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Signet Jewelers, Ltd.
Represented By
Vincent Marc Ferraro
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Michael J Zinna
Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zale Corporation
Represented By
Vincent Marc Ferraro
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Michael J Zinna
Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andra Group, LP
Represented By
Karl Anthony Rupp
Sorey & Hoover LLP
contact info
Nicholas Andrew Wyss
Nix Patterson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 2:05 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv-00131) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/30/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 01/30 3:24 PM
*All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the lead case. (Case No. 5:24-CV-131)* (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/17 4:19 PM
ORDER granting11 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendant Zale Corporation has until on or before Thursday, February 6, 2025 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/17/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/16 4:03 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Zale Corporation.(Zinna, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
10 10 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 12/20 10:11 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Zale Corporation answer is now due 1/22/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
9 9 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 12/20 9:42 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Zale Corporation. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(Zinna, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/20 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Marc Ferraro on behalf of Signet Jewelers, Ltd., Zale Corporation (Ferraro, Vincent)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/20 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Zinna on behalf of Signet Jewelers, Ltd., Zale Corporation (Zinna, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/03 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andra Group, LP. Zale Corporation served on 12/2/2024. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Wyss on behalf of Andra Group, LP (Wyss, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Zale Corporation. (slo)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 11/26 10:14 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Andra Group, LP (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 2:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Signet Jewelers, Ltd., Zale Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10516629.), filed by Andra Group, LP.(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - '498 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Garlick Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Claim Chart
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 3:24 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 3:24 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 3:25 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]