Bonarrigo et al v. Lucrazon Global, LLC et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-14364 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 07, 2015 9:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lucrazon Global, LLC, CA
|
|
Defendant
Lucrazon, LLC, CA
|
|
Plaintiff
Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TCB Worldwide, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAD Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matheau Roy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyler Moughan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MVNO Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Infinium Wireless, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Ems
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Betlejewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Briana Betlejewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amandla Worldwide, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Bonarrigo, MA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Betlejewski, CA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 03/21 4:44 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2016. Atty DePetrillo appears by telephone on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Plaintiff will file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal forthwith. (note: notice filed today see dkt entry #32.)(Atty DePetrillo by telephone)(Clerk: M.Molloy for G. MacDonald) (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Molloy, Maryellen) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/21 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 03/16 3:22 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 3/16/2016. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Additional conference set for 3/21/16 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: DePetrillo) (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 03/16 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel is instructed to call 888-808-6929 and dial 8523158.(MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 03/14 12:45 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/16/2016 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. The originally scheduled Motion Hearing has been cancelled. (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice Cancelling Hearing
Mon 03/14 12:43 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Wed 03/09 3:38 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC : Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2016 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani.(MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 02/24 6:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against Lucrazon Global, LLC, Lucrazon, LLC, filed by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC.(DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Thu 02/11 9:21 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SEE attached. (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/11 9:19 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2016 re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie at ylajoied@yahoo.com.)(Attorney present: DePetrillo) (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response to Court Order
Mon 02/08 6:44 PM
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC re22 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, .(DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Derek H. DePetrillo, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment | ||
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Fri 01/29 3:19 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. SEE attached Order for details. (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 11/17 2:14 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order To Show Cause
Thu 11/05 10:35 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO EACH PLAINTIFF LLC. Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2015.(DaSilva, Carolina) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Response to Court Order
Thu 10/29 5:12 PM
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC re18 Order to Show Cause . (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order To Show Cause
Tue 10/20 3:48 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2015.(DaSilva, Carolina) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 07/17 5:38 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by James Davis.(DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/13 8:01 PM
EXHIBIT re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC (Exhibit B - Declarations of Plaintiffs) by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/13 7:59 PM
EXHIBIT re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC (Exhibit A - Declarations of Plaintiffs) by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 07/13 7:57 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lucrazon, LLC and Lucrazon Global, LLC by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC.(DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Standing order on motions for default judgment
Thu 06/11 4:13 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
12 | 12
order
Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk
Thu 06/11 4:12 PM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lucrazon Global, LLC, Lucrazon, LLC (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Request for notice of default
Wed 05/27 4:50 PM
Request for notice of default by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC . (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/27 4:46 PM
STATUS REPORT by Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, Christine Betlejewski, Todd Betlejewski, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Scott Bonarrigo, James Davis, Curtis Ems, Infinium Wireless, LLC, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Tyler Moughan, Matheau Roy, TAD Holdings, LLC, TCB Worldwide, LLC. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/06 9:23 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott Bonarrigo. Acknowledgement filed by Scott Bonarrigo. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/06 9:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott Bonarrigo. Lucrazon Global, LLC served on 4/30/2015, answer due 5/21/2015. Acknowledgement filed by Scott Bonarrigo. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/06 9:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott Bonarrigo. Acknowledgement filed by Scott Bonarrigo. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/06 9:05 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott Bonarrigo. Lucrazon, LLC served on 12/22/2014, answer due 1/12/2015. Acknowledgement filed by Scott Bonarrigo. (DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order To Show Cause
Tue 05/05 8:17 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2015.(MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 5/5/2015 to correct judge association (MacDonald, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/01 3:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lucrazon Global, LLC, Lucrazon, LLC, Infinium Wireless, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Tyler Moughan, TAD Holdings, LLC, Curtis Ems, Christine Betlejewski, James Davis, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Matheau Roy, TCB Worldwide, LLC, filed by Scott Bonarrigo, Infinium Wireless, LLC, Briana Betlejewski, MVNO Holdings, LLC, Amandla Worldwide, LLC, Tyler Moughan, TAD Holdings, LLC, Curtis Ems, Christine Betlejewski, James Davis, Betlejewski Marketing Group, Inc., Matheau Roy, TCB Worldwide, LLC.(DePetrillo, Derek) |
|
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/09 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 12/09 2:55 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/09 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Lucrazon, LLC, Lucrazon Global, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5313920 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Todd Betlejewski, Scott Bonarrigo.(DePetrillo, Derek) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2014) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/9/2014) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Category Sheet |